Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/06/2018 at 14:16:02 (UTC).

David Thamavongsa vs. Evelyn Rodriguez

Case Summary

On 12/16/2013 David Thamavongsa filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Evelyn Rodriguez. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Ikeda, Dale, Snauffer, Mark W and Snauffer, Mark. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3833

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Ikeda, Dale

Snauffer, Mark W

Snauffer, Mark

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Thamavogsa, David

Khamsophou, Anna

Defendant

Rodriguez, Evelyn

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Smith, Ronald D.

2014 Tulare Street Suite 217

Fresno, CA 93721

Winter, Joel D

 

Court Documents

Substitution of Attorney Filed

Substitution of Attorney Filed; Comment: Old Attorney: Ronald D. Smith New Attorney: Joel D. Winter Bar# 258680

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Judgment

Request for Dismissal filed; Judgment Type: Request for Dismissal filed; Party Names: Thamavogsa, David; Khamsophou, Anna; Rodriguez, Evelyn; Snauffer, Mark W; Comment: without prejudice

Substitution of Attorney Filed

Substitution of Attorney Filed; Comment: Old Attorney: Ronald D. Smith New Attorney: Joel D. Winter Bar# 258680

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Request for Dismissal filed; Judgment Type: Request for Dismissal filed; Party Names: Thamavogsa, David; Khamsophou, Anna; Rodriguez, Evelyn; Snauffer, Mark W; Comment: without prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2015
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judicial Officer: Ikeda, Dale; Judgment Type: Dismissal Order - Entire Action; Party Names: Thamavogsa, David; Khamsophou, Anna; Rodriguez, Evelyn; Snauffer, Mark W; Comment: without prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2015
  • Order to Show Cause - Pre- Judicial Officer: Ikeda, Dale; Hearing Time: 10:02 AM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2015
  • Order to Show Cause - Pre- Judicial Officer: Ikeda, Dale; Hearing Time: 10:02 AM; Result: Continued Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Substitution of Attorney Filed- Substitution of Attorney Filed; Comment: Old Attorney: Ronald D. Smith New Attorney: Joel D. Winter Bar# 258680

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Substitution of Attorney Filed- Substitution of Attorney Filed; Comment: Old Attorney: Ronald D. Smith New Attorney: Joel D. Winter Bar# 258680

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2015
  • Clerk Cert of Mailing Printed- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CDAEVNT on 16-MAR-2015 by JVERBERA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2015
  • Minute order printed- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CDAEVNT on 16-MAR-2015 by JVERBERA.

    Read MoreRead Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 12/16/2013
  • JBSIS: New Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$435.00 was made on receipt CVCE185092.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Notice of Case Mgnt Conf- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CSAEVNT on 16-DEC-2013 by GSAUCEDA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Summons filed- Comment: Summons on Complaint filed gs.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Civil case cover sheet- Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet gs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: gs Event: Civil complaint filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Event: New Civil Case Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Financial info for Thamavogsa, David: Counter Payment Receipt # 185092 Thamavogsa, David $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Financial info for Thamavogsa, David: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Financial: Thamavogsa, David; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less