This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/13/2018 at 13:19:09 (UTC).

David Roberts vs. Richard Manukyan

Case Summary

On 11/17/2016 David Roberts filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Richard Manukyan. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Dalesandro, Samuel. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2627

  • Filing Date:

    11/17/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Dalesandro, Samuel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Roberts, David M.

Defendants

Manukyan, Richard

A & H Auto

 

Court Documents

Judgment

Civil Document; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To:; Roberts, David M.; Awarded Against:; Manukyan, Richard; Amount; Damages: $420.00; Costs: $70.00; Total: $490.00; Comment: Statement of Decision: Lack of compliance with California Business and Professions Code 9880 and sections that follow relating to provision of written estimate 9884.9 (a).; Party Names: Roberts, David M.; Manukyan, Richard

Request Filed

Request Filed; Comment: Creditors request for funds done at the window

Deposit, payment,disbursment

Deposit, payment,disbursment; Comment: $791.80 in Trust

Request Filed

Request Filed; Comment: To Pay Judgment to Court

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: OX

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment Filed

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment Filed; Comment: Costs: $230.00 Credit: $0.00 Interest: $ 41.90

Application and Order for Examination

Application and Order for Examination; Comment: Of Judgment Debtor filed.

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment Filed

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment Filed; Comment: Costs: $70.00 Credit: $0.00 Interest: $16.75

Order Denied

Order Denied; Judicial Officer: Judge, Pro Tempore; Comment: Order on Request to Make Payments

Writ of Execution Issued

Writ of Execution Issued; Comment: County: Fresno Amount: 515.00

Response filed

Response filed; Comment: Plaintiff David Roberts

Clerk's Certificate of Mailing

Clerk's Certificate of Mailing; Comment: I certify that I am not a party to this cause and a true copy of the ( Request to make payments (Second mailing wrong address. ) was placed in a sealed envelope and placed for collection and mailing on the date and at the place shown below following our ordinary business practice. I am readily familiar with this court's practice for collection and processing correspondence for mailing. On the same day that correspondence is placed for collection and mailing, it is deposited in the ordinary course of business with the United States Postal Service with postage fully prepaid. Place of Mailing: Fresno, California on ( 4-26-17 ) . Parties served: ( plaintiff )

Clerk's Certificate of Mailing

Clerk's Certificate of Mailing; Comment: I certify that I am not a party to this cause and a true copy of the ( request to make payments ) was placed in a sealed envelope and placed for collection and mailing on the date and at the place shown below following our ordinary business practice. I am readily familiar with this court's practice for collection and processing correspondence for mailing. On the same day that correspondence is placed for collection and mailing, it is deposited in the ordinary course of business with the United States Postal Service with postage fully prepaid. Place of Mailing: Fresno, California on ( 4-11-17 ) . Parties served: ( Plaintiff )

Request Filed

Request Filed; Comment: Request to Make Payments

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Plaintiff's Claim filed

Plaintiff's Claim filed

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Civil Document; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To:; Roberts, David M.; Awarded Against:; Manukyan, Richard; Amount; Damages: $420.00; Costs: $70.00; Total: $490.00; Comment: Statement of Decision: Lack of compliance with California Business and Professions Code 9880 and sections that follow relating to provision of written estimate 9884.9 (a).; Party Names: Roberts, David M.; Manukyan, Richard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request Filed- Request Filed; Comment: Creditors request for funds done at the window

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • Order of Examination- Judicial Officer: Dalesandro, Samuel; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Settled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Deposit, payment,disbursment- Deposit, payment,disbursment; Comment: $791.80 in Trust

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • Clerk's Certificate of Mailing- Comment: I certify that I am not a party to this cause and a true copy of the ( Request to Pay Judgment to Court ) was placed in a sealed envelope and placed for collection and mailing on the date and at the place shown below following our ordinary business practice. I am readily familiar with this court's practice for collection and processing correspondence for mailing. On the same day that correspondence is placed for collection and mailing, it is deposited in the ordinary course of business with the United States Postal Service with postage fully prepaid. Place of Mailing: Fresno, California on ( 1/25/18 ) . Parties served: ( David M. Roberts )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • Satisfaction of Judgment in Full filed- Comment: See request to pay judgment to court 1/25/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request Filed- Request Filed; Comment: To Pay Judgment to Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • Other- Comment: OX- Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service- Proof of Service; Comment: OX

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Costs After Judgment Filed- Memorandum of Costs After Judgment Filed; Comment: Costs: $230.00 Credit: $0.00 Interest: $ 41.90

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 11/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Plaintiff's Claim filed- Plaintiff's Claim filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • Financial info for Roberts, David M.: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2018-00001140 Roberts, David M. $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • Financial info for Roberts, David M.: Transaction Assessment $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • Financial info for Roberts, David M.: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2017-00023100 Roberts, David M. $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • Financial info for Roberts, David M.: Transaction Assessment $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2017
  • Financial info for Roberts, David M.: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2017-00011421 Roberts, David M. $27.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2017
  • Financial info for Roberts, David M.: Transaction Assessment $27.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2016
  • Financial info for Roberts, David M.: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2016-00038324 Roberts, David M. $30.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2016
  • Financial info for Roberts, David M.: Transaction Assessment $30.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2016
  • Financial: Roberts, David M.; Total Financial Assessment $137.00; Total Payments and Credits $137.00

    Read MoreRead Less