This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/02/2018 at 19:12:47 (UTC).

XXXXX

Case Summary

On 10/25/2012 XXXXX was filed as a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Ikeda, Dale, Culver Kapetan, Kristi and Snauffer, Mark. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3451

  • Filing Date:

    10/25/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Ikeda, Dale

Culver Kapetan, Kristi

Snauffer, Mark

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Madrigal, Danny

Madrigal, Rohelia

Defendants

San Joaquin Figs Inc

Cederquist, Gerald W.

Coleman Land Co, LLC

C W Nursery, L L C

Cederquist, Gerald W

Schmall, Ron

Schmall, Judy

Coleman, Kimberly P

Coleman, Thomas T

Corgiat, Armand

Corgiat, Jennifer

Jura, Keith

San Joaquin Figs, Inc

Coleman Land Co., LLC

C.W. Nursery, LLC.

Coleman, Thomas T.

Deran, Inc.

C. W. Nursery, L.L.C.

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant

Deran, Inc.

Cross Defendant and Defendant

Cederquist, Gerald W.

5 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Peters, Craig

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

Piekut, Kevin

Rubin, G. David

Hoppe, Theodore W.

Conant, Matthew S

Other Attorneys

Linsao, Miljoy B

 

Court Documents

Judgment

Summary Judgment Entered; Judicial Officer: Culver Kapetan, Kristi; Judgment Type: Summary Judgment Entered; Comment: (It is ordered, adjudged and decreed that: Judgment is entered in favor of Gerald W. Cederquist and against Plaintiff in intervention Insurance Company of the West, as to Plaintiff in Intervention's Complaint in Intervention. Plaintiff in Intervention shall recover nothing against Cederquist. Cederquist is a "prevailing party" in this action as to the term is defined in Code of Civil Procedure section 1032. Subdivision (a)(4), and is entitled to recover from Plaintiff in Intervention his costs of suit. Cederquist may file a memorandum of costs within the applicable deadline under rule 3.1700(a)(1) of the California Rules of Court. )

Judgment

Summary Judgment Entered; Judicial Officer: Culver Kapetan, Kristi; Judgment Type: Summary Judgment Entered; Comment: (It is ordered, adjudged and decreed that: Judgment is entered in favor of Gerald W. Cederquist and against Plaintiffs Danny Madrigal and Rohelia Madrigal, as to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint filed in this matter. Plaintiff shall recover nothing against Cederquist.. Cederquist is a "prevailing party" in this action as that term is defined is Code of Civil Procedure section 1032, subdivision (a)(4), and is entitled recover from Plaintiffs his costs of suit in this action. Cederquist may file a memorandum of costs within the applicable deadline under rule 3.1700(a)(1) of the California Rules of Court.)

Judgment

Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: Deran Inc; Comment: With Prejudice

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Memorandum of Points and Authorities

Memorandum of Points and Authorities

Notice of Motion

Notice of Motion; Comment: and Motion to: tax costs

Notice of Entry of Judgment

Notice of Entry of Judgment

Notice of Entry of Judgment

Notice of Entry of Judgment

Motion

Motion; Comment: Specially Appearing Defendant Randolph Manufacturing Company, Inc's. Motion to Quash Service of Summons and Complaint

Judgment

Dismissal - Other filed; Judgment Type: Dismissal - Other filed; Party Names: Deran, Inc.; Cederquist, Gerald W.; Comment: without prejudice.; Comment: (As to Cross Complaint filed by Gerald W. Cederquist)

Judgment

Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: Randolph Manufacturing Company; Comment: with prejudice

Judgment

Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Names: Deran, Inc.; Deran, Inc.; Comment: with prejudice

Response filed

Response filed; Comment: to Hearing Regarding Dismissal

Notice of Settlement filed

Civil Document; Comment: Unconditional settlement reached and filed. Project completion date: 7/6/15

Statement filed

Statement filed; Comment: defendant Gerald Cederquist's statement in response to plaintiffs motion to tax defendants costs and plaintiff in intervention's joinder to plaintiffs motion

Amended Document Filed

Civil Document; Comment: Notice of Motion to quash service of summons and complaint

Memorandum of Costs filed

Civil Document; Comment: Total Costs: $ 21,122.60

Memorandum of Costs filed

Civil Document; Comment: Total Costs: $ 21,122.60

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Summary Judgment Entered; Judicial Officer: Culver Kapetan, Kristi; Judgment Type: Summary Judgment Entered; Comment: (It is ordered, adjudged and decreed that: Judgment is entered in favor of Gerald W. Cederquist and against Plaintiff in intervention Insurance Company of the West, as to Plaintiff in Intervention's Complaint in Intervention. Plaintiff in Intervention shall recover nothing against Cederquist. Cederquist is a "prevailing party" in this action as to the term is defined in Code of Civil Procedure section 1032. Subdivision (a)(4), and is entitled to recover from Plaintiff in Intervention his costs of suit. Cederquist may file a memorandum of costs within the applicable deadline under rule 3.1700(a)(1) of the California Rules of Court. )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Summary Judgment Entered; Judicial Officer: Culver Kapetan, Kristi; Judgment Type: Summary Judgment Entered; Comment: (It is ordered, adjudged and decreed that: Judgment is entered in favor of Gerald W. Cederquist and against Plaintiffs Danny Madrigal and Rohelia Madrigal, as to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint filed in this matter. Plaintiff shall recover nothing against Cederquist.. Cederquist is a "prevailing party" in this action as that term is defined is Code of Civil Procedure section 1032, subdivision (a)(4), and is entitled recover from Plaintiffs his costs of suit in this action. Cederquist may file a memorandum of costs within the applicable deadline under rule 3.1700(a)(1) of the California Rules of Court.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal - Other filed; Judgment Type: Dismissal - Other filed; Party Names: Deran, Inc.; Cederquist, Gerald W.; Comment: without prejudice.; Comment: (As to Cross Complaint filed by Gerald W. Cederquist)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: Deran Inc; Comment: With Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: Randolph Manufacturing Company; Comment: with prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Names: Deran, Inc.; Deran, Inc.; Comment: with prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2015
  • Continued 225 Dismissal- Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Cancel Reason: Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2015
  • CRC225 Dismiss After Settlement- Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Result: Heard; Comment: hearing set on 8/10/15 in error, re-scheduled to 8/31/15.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Response filed- Response filed; Comment: to Hearing Regarding Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
282 More Docket Entries
  • 04/28/2015
  • Financial info for Madrigal, Danny: Transaction Assessment $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2015
  • Financial info for Madrigal, Danny: Counter Payment Receipt # 199253 Madrigal, Danny $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2015
  • Financial info for Madrigal, Danny: Transaction Assessment $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2013
  • Financial info for Madrigal, Danny: Counter Payment Receipt # 177915 Madrigal, Danny $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2013
  • Financial info for Madrigal, Danny: Transaction Assessment $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2013
  • Financial info for Madrigal, Danny: Counter Payment Receipt # 173862 Madrigal, Danny $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2013
  • Financial info for Madrigal, Danny: Transaction Assessment $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2012
  • Financial info for Madrigal, Danny: Counter Payment Receipt # 170966 Madrigal, Danny $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2012
  • Financial info for Madrigal, Danny: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2012
  • Financial: Madrigal, Danny; Total Financial Assessment $725.00; Total Payments and Credits $725.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

© 0 93 A B WN

= e e mfl&m&mwwowmflofiagaszg

DANNY MADRIGAL and ROHBLIA MADRIGAL, |

Plaintiffs, VS, |

SAN JOAQUIN FIGS, INC.; CCDLEMAN LAND CO., LLC; C. W. NURSERY, LLC; GERALD W, CEDERQUIST RON SCHMALL; JUDY SCHMALL; KIMBERLY P, COLEMAN,; THOMAS T. COLEMAN; ARMAND CORGIAT; JENNIFER CORGIAT; KEITH JURA; and DOES 1 through 100, and each of them, |

Defendan}:s .-

CEDFRQUIST RON SCHMALL JUDY

| SCHMALL, KIMBERLY P, C(DLEMAN

THOMAS T, COLEMAN, ARMAND CORGIAT, JENNIFER CORGIAT, KEITH JURA, and DOES 1

| THROUGH 100, and each of them,

Defend-ants in Intervention,

SUPERIOII{ COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

EILED FEB 2 6 2015 RIOR COURT

FRESNO d

By —— 5T 403 DEP Y

COUNTY OF FRESNO

Case No.: 12CECG03451 KCK

Assigned for All Purposes to the Honorable

| {ri.s'ti Culver Kapet nf -

JUDGMDNT ASTO COMPLAINT IN INTERVENTION

[CCP § 437.(9)]

Complaint Filed: October 25,2012 | First Amended Complaint Filed: June 19, 2013

Trial Date: July'6, 2015

Trial Date: July'6, 2015 IR ATTORNEYS OF RDCORD HEREIN: ‘1’& GERALD W, CEDERQUIST’ (“Cederqulst”) Motion for Summary rvontion INSURANCE COMPANY OF TI-_IE WEST’s (“Plaintiff in

IR ATTORNEYS OF RDCORD HEREIN: ‘1’& GERALD W, CEDERQUIST’ (“Cederqulst”) Motion for Summary rvontion INSURANCE COMPANY OF TI-_IE WEST’s (“Plaintiff in

vention on January 23, 2015,

l UDGED AND DECREED THAT:

lered in favor of Gerald W. Cederquist and against Plaintiff in ance Company of the West, at to Plaintiff in Intervention’s Complaint

sntion shall recover nothing against Cederquist,

yrevailing party” in this action as thet term is defined in Code of Civil

| 1032, subdivision (a)(4), and Is entitled to recover from Plaintiff in | 4