This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/13/2018 at 10:44:57 (UTC).

Danielle Vesper vs. Jose Arredondo

Case Summary

On 10/28/2016 Danielle Vesper filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against Jose Arredondo. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Culver Kapetan, Kristi. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3502

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Culver Kapetan, Kristi

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Vesper, Danielle

Defendants

Jose Arredondo Enterprises, Inc.

Arredondo, Jose

Hanford Toyota

Hanford Hyundai

Hanford Motors Cars, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ruggiero, Cheryl Konell

Defendant Attorney

Scali, Christian J.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review

Request for Full Dismissal; Comment: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Notice of Settlement filed

Notice of Settlement of Entire Case

Notice Filed

Notice; Comment: Notice of Settlement of Entire Case - No action taken not filed on Judicial Coucil form CM-200

Proof of Service

1486945-01_727Vesper; Comment: Hanford Motors Cars, Inc.

Proof of Service

1468386_667Vesper_PO; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service

1451696_302ProofofSe; Comment: Jose Arredondo Enterprises

Summons issued and filed

Vesper_Summons.pdf; Summons issued and filed; Comment: Summons

Civil Complaint filed

Vesper_Complaint.pdf; Comment: Complaint

Judgment

Request for Dismissal filed; Judgment Type: Request for Dismissal filed; Party Names: Vesper, Danielle; Arredondo, Jose; Hanford Hyundai; Jose Arredondo Enterprises, Inc.; Hanford Toyota; Hanford Motors Cars, Inc.; Comment: With Prejudice

Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed

30295 - notice.pdf

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Answer Filed

Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - First Appearance Fee; Comment: Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - First Appearance Fee

Amendment filed

1468722_566Vesper_Do; Comment: Amendment to Complaint/First Amended Complaint (Fictitious Name)

Proof of Service

1451696_827ProofofSe; Comment: Jose Arredondo

Amended Document Filed

1417130_382Vesper_Fi; Comment: First Amended Complaint

Summons issued and filed

Vesper_Summons.pdf; Summons issued and filed; Comment: Summons

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing; Comment: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGE FOR ALL PURPOSES

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Request for Dismissal filed; Judgment Type: Request for Dismissal filed; Party Names: Vesper, Danielle; Arredondo, Jose; Hanford Hyundai; Jose Arredondo Enterprises, Inc.; Hanford Toyota; Hanford Motors Cars, Inc.; Comment: With Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • CRC225 Dismiss After Settlement- Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Cancel Reason: Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed- 30295 - notice.pdf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Letter of Documents Returned Without Filing- Letter of Documents Returned Without Filing; Comment: Notice of Entry of Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review- Request for Full Dismissal; Comment: Request for Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • Case Management Conference- Hearing Time: 2:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Settled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing- Notice of Hearing; Comment: 225 set for 10/16/17 at 1pm Rm #305

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • Case Management Conference- Hearing Time: 2:30 PM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Settlement filed- Notice of Settlement of Entire Case

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 02/17/2017
  • Financial: Jose Arredondo Enterprises, Inc.; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2017
  • Financial info for Hanford Hyundai: EFile Payment Receipt # ACCT-2017-00750 Arredondo, Jose $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2017
  • Financial info for Hanford Hyundai: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2017
  • Financial: Hanford Hyundai; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2017
  • Financial info for Arredondo, Jose: EFile Payment Receipt # ACCT-2017-00749 Arredondo, Jose $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2017
  • Financial info for Arredondo, Jose: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2017
  • Financial: Arredondo, Jose; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2016
  • Financial info for Vesper, Danielle: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2016-49302 Vesper, Danielle $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2016
  • Financial info for Vesper, Danielle: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2016
  • Financial: Vesper, Danielle; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less