Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 02/27/2018 at 04:00:39 (UTC).

Daniel Tim Lalanne vs Sandi Marmolejo Lalanne

Case Summary

On 03/12/2013 Daniel Tim Lalanne filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Sandi Marmolejo Lalanne. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Nystrom-Geist, Kimberly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1387

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2013

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Nystrom-Geist, Kimberly

 

Party Details

Other and Petitioner

Lalanne, Daniel Tim

Selma, CA 93662

Respondent

Lalanne, Sandi Marmolejo

Minors

Lalanne, Karli

Lalanne, Matthew

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/28/2013
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Conversion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2015
  • Historical Documents- Comment: DMS Conversion Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2013
  • Judgment Scanned FL Ret- Comment: Family Law Judgment Date: 08/28/2013 Scanned Date: 10/15/13 lml 10/15/13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2013
  • 1 Family - Centered Status Conference- Original Type: 1 Family - Centered Status Conference; Judicial Officer: Nystrom-Geist, Kimberly; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Result: Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2013
  • Off calendar- Comment: Off calendar for 2-CMC scheduled for 09-04-13 10:30 am D202 Judgment entered. 08-28-13 rym

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2013
  • File forwarded- Comment: File forwarded to: scanning shelf 08-28-13 rym

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2013
  • Notice of entry of judgment- Comment: Notice of entry of judgment filed. 08-28-13 rym

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2013
  • Fld judgmnt disso marr bfr hrg- Comment: Judgment granted/marital termination date 10-18-13 08-28-13 rym

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Dissolution _x__ Legal Separation ___ 08-28-13 rym Event: Decl Default Uncontested Disso

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2013
  • Request to Enter Default filed- Comment: Request to Enter Default filed. Default entered as to Respondent. 08-28-13 rym

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 05/03/2013
  • Returned documents letter- Comment: Documents returned: Proof of Service of Summons Reason: #4 The "Notice to the Person Served" was left unmarked. Sent back in SASE to Parga and Associates. Date: sb 05/03/13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2013
  • Notice sent- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CMAINIT on 13-MAR-2013 by JCOHAN.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2013
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$435.00 was made on receipt FLCE199326.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2013
  • JBSIS: New Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2013
  • Uniform custody juris- Comment: Filed declaration under uniform child custody jurisdiction act. Child/ren residence for past 6 months: and period of residence: from 08/2011- present with Mother in Fresno, Ca. Copy sent back in sase. sb 03/13/13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Summons Issued Yes _x__ No ___ Judge McGuire. Copy sent back in sase. sb 03/13/13 Event: Pet Disso Marr w/children

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Plaintiff(s)/Petitioner(s) in propria persona sb 03/13/13 Event: Pltf/Ptnr in Propria Persona

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2013
  • Financial info for Lalanne, Daniel Tim: Counter Payment Receipt # 199326 Lalanne, Daniel Tim $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2013
  • Financial info for Lalanne, Daniel Tim: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2013
  • Financial: Lalanne, Daniel Tim; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less