This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/13/2018 at 00:59:09 (UTC).

Daniel Nieto vs.Fresno Beverage Company, Inc.

Case Summary

On 08/12/2016 Daniel Nieto filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Fresno Beverage Company, Inc. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Snauffer, Mark. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2614

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Snauffer, Mark

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Nieto, Daniel

Defendant

Fresno Beverage Company, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Yoon, Kenneth H

Defendant Attorney

McGuigan, Kathryn T.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Clerk's Certificate of Mailing

Clerk's Certificate of Mailing; Comment: I certify that I am not a party to this cause and a true copy of the (Minute Order/ Tentative Ruling ) was placed in a sealed envelope and placed for collection and mailing on the date and at the place shown below following our ordinary business practice. I am readily familiar with this court's practice for collection and processing correspondence for mailing. On the same day that correspondence is placed for collection and mailing, it is deposited in the ordinary course of business with the United States Postal Service with postage fully prepaid. Place of Mailing: Fresno, California on ( ) . Parties served: ( )

Minute Order Attachment (Tentative Rulings Only)

Civil Document

Notice Filed

18 CourtCall K. Yoon.pdf; Comment: Notice of CourtCall Appearance - Service Copy

Objection filed

Objection; Comment: Defendant's Objections To Evidence Submitted In Support Of Plaintiff's Opposition To Defendant's Motion To Compel Arbitration And Stay Judicial Proceedings

Opposition filed

8 Pla Opp to Def MTC Arb.pdf; Comment: Plaintiff Daniel Nieto's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration

Declaration Filed

VW-Nieto Declaration of Todd Howerton.pdf; Comment: of Todd Howerton in support of petition to compel arbitration and stay judicial proceedings

Notice of Motion

VW-Nieto Notice of Motion and MTC.pdf; Comment: and motion to: compel arbitration and stay judicial proceedings

Notice Filed

Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge; Comment: of Case Management Conference and Assignement of Civil Judge for all Purposes

Notice Filed

36 CC Appearance RE CMC for K.Yoon.pdf; Comment: Notice of Courtcall Appearance - Service Copy

Notice Filed

34 Pla Ntc of CC Appearance.pdf; Comment: Notice of CourtCall Appearance - Service Copy

Stipulation and Order filed

Stipulation and Order filed; Judicial Officer: Snauffer, Mark; Comment: to Continue December 19, 2016 Case Management Conference.

Mediation Notice from 5th DCA - Appeal Suspended

Civil Appeal Meets Pre Qualifiers - Mediation Scre; Comment: Pursuant to 5th DCA Local Rule 2

Notice of Appeal Filed - Civil

Valley Wide-Nieto Notice of Appeal.pdf; Comment: Notice of Appeal

Notice Filed

21 CourtCall Service Copy.pdf; Comment: Notice of CourtCall Appearance - Service Copy

Opposition filed

20 Pla Opp to Def Ex Parte Mtn.pdf; Comment: to Defendant's Ex Parte Application Requesting an Order Staying Judicial Proceedings

Proof of Service

5 Ntc of POS of Summons.pdf; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons

Summons issued and filed

Summons and Additional Parties Attachment; Summons issued and filed; Comment: Summons and Additional Parties Attachment

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/14/2018
  • Case Management Conference- Judicial Officer: Snauffer, Mark; Hearing Time: 3:28 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice Filed- 36 CC Appearance RE CMC for K.Yoon.pdf; Comment: Notice of Courtcall Appearance - Service Copy

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment; Comment: attached certificate of mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • Case Management Conference- Judicial Officer: Snauffer, Mark; Hearing Time: 3:28 PM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • Case Management Conference- Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Heard; Comment: Stipulation Signed 12/14/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice Filed- 34 Pla Ntc of CC Appearance.pdf; Comment: Notice of CourtCall Appearance - Service Copy

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2016
  • Clerk's Certificate of Mailing Civil Appeals- Comment: Document Mailed: Register of Actions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Stipulation and Order filed- Stipulation and Order filed; Judicial Officer: Snauffer, Mark; Comment: to Continue December 19, 2016 Case Management Conference.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2016
  • Chambers Work- Pre- Judicial Officer: Snauffer, Mark; Hearing Time: 5:30 PM; Result: Chambers Work - Order Submitted for Consideration

    Read MoreRead Less
40 More Docket Entries
  • 11/09/2016
  • Financial info for Fresno Beverage Company, Inc.: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2016-50999 Fresno Beverage Company, Inc. $100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2016
  • Financial info for Fresno Beverage Company, Inc.: Transaction Assessment $100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2016
  • Financial info for Fresno Beverage Company, Inc.: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2016-47133 Fresno Beverage Company, Inc. $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2016
  • Financial info for Fresno Beverage Company, Inc.: Transaction Assessment $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • Financial info for Fresno Beverage Company, Inc.: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2016-41344 Fresno Beverage Company, Inc. $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • Financial info for Fresno Beverage Company, Inc.: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • Financial: Fresno Beverage Company, Inc.; Total Financial Assessment $615.00; Total Payments and Credits $615.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2016
  • Financial info for Nieto, Daniel: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2016-35457 Nieto, Daniel $1435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2016
  • Financial info for Nieto, Daniel: Transaction Assessment $1435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2016
  • Financial: Nieto, Daniel; Total Financial Assessment $1,435.00; Total Payments and Credits $1,435.00

    Read MoreRead Less