This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 02/28/2018 at 02:27:42 (UTC).

Daniel Harrison Hanlin vs Laura Lozoya Hanlin

Case Summary

On 12/16/2013 Daniel Harrison Hanlin filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Laura Lozoya Hanlin. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Tharpe, D Tyler. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6655

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2013

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Tharpe, D Tyler

 

Party Details

Other and Petitioner

Hanlin, Daniel Harrison

Friant, CA 93626

Respondent

Hanlin, Laura Lozoya

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/16/2014
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Conversion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2015
  • Historical Documents- Comment: DMS Conversion Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2015
  • 1 Family - Centered Status Conference- Original Type: 1 Family - Centered Status Conference; Judicial Officer: Tharpe, D Tyler; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Result: Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2014
  • Judgment Scanned FL Ret- Comment: Family Law Judgment Date: 7/16/14 Scanned Date: 8/5/14 tf 08/0514

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2014
  • File forwarded- Comment: File forwarded to:MICROFILM SHELF/RLV

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2014
  • Off calendar- Comment: CMC Off calendar./RLV

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2014
  • Fld judgmnt disso marr bfr hrg- Comment: STATUS ENDS 7.16.2014/RLV

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2014
  • Notice of entry of judgment- Comment: Notice of entry of judgment filed./RLV

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2014
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Dissolution ___/RLV l Separation ___ Event: Decl Default Uncontested Disso

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2014
  • Decl Serv Disc Inc & Expense- Comment: Preliminary or Final/RLV

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 04/22/2014
  • Minute order Judge Tharpe- Comment: Minute order from Dept: 202 Clerk: M. Nguyen/T. Flores Reporter: NR Nature of Hearing: Family-Centered Status Conf. Petitioner: Not Present Respondent: Not Present No appearance, clerk to re-notice status conference Next family centered case resolution conference is set for: 01/06/15 at 10:30am in D202 mn 04/22/14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2014
  • 1 Family - Centered Status Conference- Judicial Officer: Tharpe, D Tyler; Hearing Time: 09:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • JBSIS: New Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$435.00 was made on receipt FLCE215886.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Plaintiff(s)/Petitioner(s) in propria persona mv12/16/2013 Event: Pltf/Ptnr in Propria Persona

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Summons Issued Yes _x__ No ___ Case Assigned to Judge Duncan for all Purposes mv12/16/2013 Event: Pet Disso Marr-no children

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Notice sent- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CMAINIT on 16-DEC-2013 by MVANG.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Financial info for Hanlin, Daniel Harrison: Counter Payment Receipt # 215886 Hanlin, Daniel Harrison $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Financial info for Hanlin, Daniel Harrison: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Financial: Hanlin, Daniel Harrison; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less