This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/08/2018 at 18:41:15 (UTC).

XXXXX

Case Summary

On 10/14/2014 XXXXX was filed as a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Snauffer, Mark, Culver Kapetan, Kristi and Cullers, Mark. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3062

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Snauffer, Mark

Culver Kapetan, Kristi

Cullers, Mark

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Plaintiffs

Hong, Danh

Nguyen, Nhu Thuan Thi

Defendants

Olman Ayala, LLC a Arizona Limited Liability Co

Southwest Investments Funds, LLC, an Arizona Limited Liabili

Toofan, Fereydoun

Southwest Investments Funds, of ArizonaLLC, an Arizona Limited Liabili erroneously sued as Southwest Investments Funds,

Cross Defendant

Olman Ayala LLC, an Arizona Limited Liability Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

Lovegren-Tipton, Amy R

Webb & Bordson, Apc 466 W Fallbrook Ste 102

Fresno, CA 93711

Goldblatt, L. Steven

Decker, Jason A.

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorney

Abrams, Robert C

 

Court Documents

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Notice Filed

Notice Filed; Comment: Notice of Non Opposition to Motion for Leave to File a Verified Second Amended Complaint

Association of Attorney filed

Civil Document; Comment: Notice of Association of Counsel

Answer Filed

Civil Document; Comment: as to 1st Cross Complaint

Memorandum of Points and Authorities

Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Comment: in Opposition to motion to strike portions from cross complaint

Demurrer Filed

Civil Document

Notice of Motion

Notice of Motion; Comment: and Motion to Stirke

Cross Complaint Filed

Civil Document; Comment: filed on behalf of Olman Ayala, LLC

Answer Filed

Civil Document; Comment: to first amended complaint

Notice Filed

Notice; Comment: Notice of Association of Counsel for Cross-Defendants Danh Hong and Nhu Thuan Thi Nguyen

Substitution of Attorney Filed

Substitution of Attorney; Comment: Substitution of Attorney

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Request Filed

Request Filed; Comment: for judicial notice in support of plaintiffs motion for leave to file verified second amended complaint

Memorandum of Points and Authorities

Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Comment: in support of plaintiffs motion for leave to file verified second amended complaint

Stipulation and Order to Continue Trial filed

Stipulation and Order to Continue Trial filed; Judicial Officer: Snauffer, Mark; Comment: Trial continued to: Court Trial 8/24/16 @ 9 am in Dept 501 TRR 8/19/16 @ 9:30 am in Dept 501 MSC to 7/20/16 @ 1:30 in Room 575 signed by Judge Snauffer

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Memorandum of Points and Authorities

Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Comment: in Opposition to demurrer to cross complaint

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/30/2018
  • Court Trial- Judicial Officer: Snauffer, Mark; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: Req by Both; Est time 3 - 5 Days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2018
  • Trial Readiness- Judicial Officer: Snauffer, Mark; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • Mandatory Settlement Conference- Hearing Time: 1:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice Filed- Notice; Comment: Notice of Association of Counsel for Cross-Defendants Danh Hong and Nhu Thuan Thi Nguyen

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Substitution of Attorney Filed- Substitution of Attorney; Comment: Substitution of Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Substitution of Attorney Filed- Substitution of Attorney; Comment: Substitution of Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • Referral to ADR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • Case Management Conference- Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment; Comment: Corrected

    Read MoreRead Less
101 More Docket Entries
  • 12/09/2015
  • Financial info for Hong, Danh: Transaction Assessment $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2015
  • Financial info for Hong, Danh: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2015-00020188 Lovegren-Tipton, Amy R $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2015
  • Financial info for Hong, Danh: Transaction Assessment $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2015
  • Financial info for Hong, Danh: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2015-00020185 Lovegren-Tipton, Amy R $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2015
  • Financial info for Hong, Danh: Transaction Assessment $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2015
  • Financial info for Hong, Danh: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2015-00009157 Lovegren-Tipton, Amy R $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2015
  • Financial info for Hong, Danh: Transaction Assessment $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2014
  • Financial info for Hong, Danh: Counter Payment Receipt # 195452 Hong, Danh $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2014
  • Financial info for Hong, Danh: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2014
  • Financial: Hong, Danh; Total Financial Assessment $775.00; Total Payments and Credits $775.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

LAW OFFICE OF AMY K. LOYEGREN-TIPTON, APLC

5703 N. West Avenue, Suite 103

IFresno, California 93711

| LAW OFFICE OF AMY R. By

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS” MOTION FOR

Aniy R. Lovegren-Tipton (SBN 258697)

LOVEGREN-TIPTON, APLC o 5703 N. West Avenue, Suite 103 ' - Fresno, California 93711 - Telephone: (559) 421-9137 Facsimile: (559) 921-4333

Email: ATipton@TiptonLegal.com

Attorney for Plaintiffs, N = DANH HONG, an individual, and NHU THUAN THI NGUYEN, an individua?, <

SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA, COUNTY OF FRESNO

CIVIL UNLIMITED DIVISION

Case No.: 14CECG03062

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS’ MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE VERIFIED SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

DANH HONG, an individual, and NHU THUAN THI NGUYEN, an individual,

Plaintiffs, VS.

OLMAN AYALA, LLC, an Arizona Limited Liability Company; SOUTHWEST INVESTMENT FUNDS, LLC, an Arizona Limited Liability Company; FEREYDOUN TOOFAN, an individual; and DOES 1 through 25, inclusive,

Date: April 19,2016 Time: 3:30 p.m. Dept.: 403

Defendants.

vvvv%\vvvvv

OLMAN AYALA, LLC, an Arizona Limited Liability Company,

Cross-Complainants, Vs.

DANH HONG, an individual, and NHU THUAN THI NGUYEN, an individual,

| Cross-Defendants.

| Cross-Defendants. Plaintiffs DANH HONG and NHU THUAN THI NGUYEN hereby request the court to

Plaintiffs DANH HONG and NHU THUAN THI NGUYEN hereby request the court to

take judicial notice pursuant to California Evidence Code sections 450 et seq., and in

accordance with California Rules of Court 3.1113, subdivision (1) and 3.1306, subdivision (c),

of the following material, true and correct copies of which are attached hereto:

Exh. 1:

Exh. 2:

Exh. 3:

Exh. 4:

Exh. 5:

Fresno City Municipal Code, Section 11-324. Substandard Buildings

Fresno City Municipal Code, Section 11-306. Abatement of Substandard Buildings

California Electrical Code (2013), Sec. 89.108, subd. 89.108.4.1 (“Permits™)

California Electrical Code (2013), Sec. 89.108, subd. 89.108.1 (“Purpose™)

California Electrical Code (2013), Sec. 89.108, subd. 89.108.4.4 (“Inspections™)

Exhibits 1-2 are duly enacted municipal resolutions and ordinances and are, therefore,

properly subject to judicial notice under California Evidence Code section 452, subds. (b) and

(h) (See also, Jordan v. Los Angeles County (1968) 267 Cal.App.2d 794, 798 [Evidence Code §

452(b) permits judicial notice of legislative enactments of 'any public entity in the United

States.""]); Shapiro v. Board of Directors of Centre City (2005) 134 Cal.App.4th 170, 174, fn. 2

[Judicial notice of municipal resolution].)

Exhibits 3-5 are properly subject to judicial notice under California Evidence Code

section 452, subds. (a) and (b). California Evidence Code section 452, subd. (a) provides that

| courts may take judicial notice of “[t]he decisional, constitutional, and statutory law of any

state of the United States and the resolutions and private acts of the Congress of the United

States and of the Legislature of this state.” California Evidence Code section 452, subd. (b)

provides that courts may take judicial notice of “[r]egulations and legislative enactments issued

| by or under the authbrity of the United States or any publi-c'ehtity in the United Statevs.’»’

- REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS’ MOTION FOR