This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/10/2018 at 18:28:41 (UTC).

Dana McConnell vs.Fresno Heart and Surgical Hospital

Case Summary

On 12/17/2015 Dana McConnell filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against Fresno Heart and Surgical Hospital. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Dalesandro, Samuel, Diaz, Monica and Black, Donald. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3827

  • Filing Date:

    12/17/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Dalesandro, Samuel

Diaz, Monica

Black, Donald

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

McConnell, Kathleena

McConnell, Terri

McConnell, Dana

Surviving biological granddaughter of Decedent Michael McConnell

Surviving spouse of Decedent, Michael Mc

Surviving biological daughter of Decedent Michael McConnell

Defendants

Fresno Heart and Surgical Hospital

Che, Fredrick, Medical Doctor

Ghiassi, Saber, Medical Doctor

Lee, Wai, Medical Doctor

Daniel, Vijai, Medical Doctor

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Moeck, David M.

Thornton, Douglas V.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Filed Stipulation for Commissioner Dalesandro

Filed Stipulation for Commissioner Dalesandro

Fax Received

Fax Received; Comment: Letter faxed by Attorney David Moeck requesting 11/29/17 Motion to be Relieved as Counsel off calendar. Per Judge McGuire okay to vacate hearing

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Filed Stipulation for Commissioner Dalesandro

Filed Stipulation for Commissioner Dalesandro

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Civil Complaint filed

Civil Document

Substitution of Attorney Filed

Substitution of Attorney; Comment: Substitution of Attorney

Affidavit

Affidavit; Comment: Due diligence re: service of notice of motion to be relieved as counsel.

Affidavit

Affidavit; Comment: Due diligence re: service of notice of motion to be relieved as counsel.

Affidavit

Affidavit; Comment: Due diligence re: service of notice of motion to be relieved as counsel.

Notice of Motion

Notice of Motion; Comment: and Motion to: be Relieved as Counsel

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Summons issued and filed

Civil Document

Civil case cover sheet

Civil Document

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/15/2018
  • Order to Show Cause - Pre- Judicial Officer: Diaz, Monica; Hearing Time: 8:32 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Substitution of Attorney Filed- Substitution of Attorney; Comment: Substitution of Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • Motion - Withdrawal of Attorney- Judicial Officer: Black, Donald; Hearing Time: 3:28 PM; Cancel Reason: Off Calendar; Comment: Edward Fannuchi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Filed Stipulation for Commissioner Dalesandro- Filed Stipulation for Commissioner Dalesandro

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • Order to Show Cause - Pre- Judicial Officer: Dalesandro, Samuel; Hearing Time: 9:32 AM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Substitution of Attorney Filed- Substitution of Attorney; Comment: Substitution of Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • Motion - Withdrawal of Attorney- Judicial Officer: Black, Donald; Hearing Time: 3:28 PM; Cancel Reason: Off Calendar; Comment: Fanucci

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Fax Received- Fax Received; Comment: Letter faxed by Attorney David Moeck requesting 11/29/17 Motion to be Relieved as Counsel off calendar. Per Judge McGuire okay to vacate hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Affidavit- Affidavit; Comment: Due diligence re: service of notice of motion to be relieved as counsel.

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 04/18/2016
  • Case Management Conference- Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed- Civil Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing- Civil Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Complaint filed- Civil Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil case cover sheet- Civil Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • Financial info for McConnell, Dana: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2017-61172 McConnell, Dana $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • Financial info for McConnell, Dana: Transaction Assessment $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2015
  • Financial info for McConnell, Dana: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2015-00034368 Quinlan, Kershaw, & Fanucchi $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2015
  • Financial info for McConnell, Dana: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2015
  • Financial: McConnell, Dana; Total Financial Assessment $495.00; Total Payments and Credits $495.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.