This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 02/28/2018 at 02:29:33 (UTC).

Dana Davis vs Robin Davis

Case Summary

On 12/16/2013 Dana Davis filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Robin Davis. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Tharpe, D Tyler. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6667

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2013

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Tharpe, D Tyler

 

Party Details

Other and Petitioner

Davis, Dana

Fresno, CA 93720

Respondent

Davis, Robin

Minors

Davis, Hannah

Davis, Jacob

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/20/2014
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Conversion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2015
  • Historical Documents- Comment: DMS Conversion Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2015
  • 1 Family - Centered Status Conference- Original Type: 1 Family - Centered Status Conference; Judicial Officer: Tharpe, D Tyler; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Result: Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2014
  • Judgment Scanned FL Ret- Comment: Family Law Judgment Date: 5/20/14 Scanned Date: 8/4/14 tf 8/4/14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2014
  • Off calendar- Comment: Off calendar for CMC scheduled for 01-13-15 Judgment entered. 05-20-14 rym

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2014
  • File forwarded- Comment: File forwarded to: scanning shelf 05-20-14 rym

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2014
  • Notice of entry of judgment- Comment: Notice of entry of judgment filed. 05-20-14 rym

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2014
  • Fld judgmnt disso marr bfr hrg- Comment: Judgment granted/marital termination date 07-11-14 05-20-14 rym

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2014
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Dissolution _x__ Legal Separation ___ 05-20-14 rym Event: Decl Default Uncontested Disso

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2014
  • Waiver filed- Comment: Waiver of Final Disclosures by both parties filed. 05-20-14 rym

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 01/21/2014
  • Proof of service-summons filed- Comment: Proof of service of petition, summons, blank response with case status hearing filed showing service on Robin Davis by personal service on 1/10/14. dc 1/27/14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2013
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$435.00 was made on receipt FLCE215934.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2013
  • Notice sent- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CMAINIT on 17-DEC-2013 by DCALABRESE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • JBSIS: New Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Plaintiff(s)/Petitioner(s) in propria persona dc 12/17/13 Event: Pltf/Ptnr in Propria Persona

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Uniform custody juris- Comment: Filed declaration under uniform child custody jurisdiction act. Child/ren residence for past 6 months: and period of residence: 08/01/13 to present dc 12/17/13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Summons Issued Yes _X__assigned to Judge Duncan dc 12/17/13 Event: Pet Disso Marr w/children

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2013
  • Financial info for Davis, Dana: Counter Payment Receipt # 215934 Davis, Dana $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2013
  • Financial info for Davis, Dana: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2013
  • Financial: Davis, Dana; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less