Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 02/27/2018 at 04:02:11 (UTC).

Dalila C. Pace vs Daniel De'von Pace

Case Summary

On 03/12/2013 Dalila C Pace filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Daniel De'von Pace. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1354

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

 

Party Details

Others and Petitioners

Pace, Dalila C.

Pace, Daniel De'von

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/28/2013
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Conversion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2013
  • Judgment Scanned FL Ret- Comment: Family Law Judgment Date: 06/28/2013 Scanned Date: 10/15/13 lml 10/15/13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2013
  • File forwarded- Comment: File forwarded to: scanning 6-28-13 ddk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2013
  • Joint Disso Final- Comment: marital status terminates 9-13-13 Wife's former name restored: Neri 6-28-13 ddk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2013
  • File forwarded- Comment: File forwarded to:FLEX shelf for Judgment Review. Date on Shelf 3/13/13. mp 3/13/13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2013
  • JBSIS: New Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2013
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$435.00 was made on receipt FLCE199200.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2013
  • File forwarded- Comment: File forwarded to: flex for rev of jgmt. hgy 03/12/13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Plaintiff(s)/Petitioner(s) in propria persona hgy 03/12/13 Event: Pltf/Ptnr in Propria Persona

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: hgy 03/15/13 Event: Joint Petition Disso

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2013
  • Financial info for Pace, Dalila C.: Counter Payment Receipt # 199200 Pace, Dalila C. $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2013
  • Financial info for Pace, Dalila C.: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2013
  • Financial: Pace, Dalila C.; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less