This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/06/2018 at 14:20:23 (UTC).

Cynthia Herbert vs Charles Casparian

Case Summary

On 12/16/2013 Cynthia Herbert filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against Charles Casparian. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Ikeda, Dale, Snauffer, Mark and Culver Kapetan, Kristi. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3892

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Ikeda, Dale

Snauffer, Mark

Culver Kapetan, Kristi

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Herbert, Cynthia

Defendants

Casparian, Charles

Lancaster, Katrina

Harris, Teresa

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kilduff, Vincent J.

181 Devine Street

San Jose, CA 95110

Defendant Attorney

Rube, Melvin K.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Judgment

Request for Dismissal filed; Judgment Type: Request for Dismissal filed; Party Names: Herbert, Cynthia; Casparian, Charles; Lancaster, Katrina; Harris, Teresa; Culver Kapetan, Kristi; Comment: With Prejudice.

Deposit, payment,disbursment

Deposit, payment,disbursment; Comment: Jury Fees $150.00

Case Management Statement Filed

Case Management Statement Filed

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Dismissal Not Entered

Dismissal Not Entered; Comment: Request for dismissal filed. Dismissal not entered as requested for the following reason: Attorney's signature is required.

ADR Stipulation Mediation filed

Civil Document; Comment: Parties to engage in mediation. Mediator: Hon. Robert H. Oliver

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Request for Dismissal filed; Judgment Type: Request for Dismissal filed; Party Names: Herbert, Cynthia; Casparian, Charles; Lancaster, Katrina; Harris, Teresa; Culver Kapetan, Kristi; Comment: With Prejudice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2016
  • Jury Trial- Judicial Officer: Snauffer, Mark; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissed; Comment: By Plaintiff; Estimated time for trial is 5-7 days.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2016
  • Trial Readiness- Judicial Officer: Snauffer, Mark; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2016
  • Mandatory Settlement Conference- Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Dismissal Not Entered- Dismissal Not Entered; Comment: Request for dismissal filed. Dismissal not entered as requested for the following reason: Attorney's signature is required.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2015
  • OSC - ADR Stipulation- Judicial Officer: Ikeda, Dale; Hearing Time: 10:07 AM; Cancel Reason: Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2015
  • OSC - ADR Stipulation- Judicial Officer: Ikeda, Dale; Hearing Time: 10:07 AM; Result: Heard; Comment: To All Parties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • ADR Stipulation Mediation filed- Civil Document; Comment: Parties to engage in mediation. Mediator: Hon. Robert H. Oliver

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
62 More Docket Entries
  • 02/27/2014
  • Financial info for Lancaster, Katrina: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2014
  • Financial: Lancaster, Katrina; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2014
  • Financial info for Casparian, Charles: Counter Payment Receipt # 187529 Casparian, Charles $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2014
  • Financial info for Casparian, Charles: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2014
  • Financial: Casparian, Charles; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2015
  • Financial info for Herbert, Cynthia: Mail Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2015-00003547 Kilduff, Vincent J. $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2015
  • Financial info for Herbert, Cynthia: Transaction Assessment $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2013
  • Financial info for Herbert, Cynthia: Counter Payment Receipt # 185319 Herbert, Cynthia $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2013
  • Financial info for Herbert, Cynthia: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2013
  • Financial: Herbert, Cynthia; Total Financial Assessment $585.00; Total Payments and Credits $585.00

    Read MoreRead Less