This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 07/23/2019 at 21:09:42 (UTC).

Cruz Amezcua vs.Vita-Pakt Citrus Products Co./CLASS ACTION

Case Summary

On 06/17/2016 Cruz Amezcua filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Vita-Pakt Citrus Products Co /CLASS ACTION. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Simpson, Alan, Gaab, Kimberly, Black, Donald, Snauffer, Mark, McGuire, Rosemary and Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3798

  • Filing Date:

    06/17/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Simpson, Alan

Gaab, Kimberly

Black, Donald

Snauffer, Mark

McGuire, Rosemary

Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Amezcua, Cruz

Defendant

Vita-Pakt Citrus Products Co.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Farley, Greg A.

Defendant Attorneys

Borchers, Jason H.

Moody, Patrick S.

 

Court Documents

Ex parte Filed

Ex Parte Application.pdf; Comment: Ex Parte Application for Continuance of Trial and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof; Declaration of Patrick S. Moody in Support Thereof

Memorandum of Points and Authorities

Amezcua v Vita-ClassCertMemo(Final).pdf; Comment: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment; Comment: Superior Court County of Los Angeles

Case Management Statement Filed

Case Management Statement Filed

General Denial Filed

General Denial Filed

Notice Filed

Notice Filed; Comment: case management conference

Notice Filed

Notice Filed; Comment: Case Managment Conference

Notice Filed

Notice Filed; Comment: Peremptory Challenge 170.6 Judge Barbara Scheper

Civil Complaint filed

Civil Document

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment; Comment: attached certificate of mailing

Minute Order Attachment (Tentative Rulings Only)

Civil Document; Comment: attached certificate of mailing

Declaration Filed

Amezcua v. Vita -- Farley Decl Prel App (f).pdf; Comment: Declaration of Gregg A. Farley in Support of Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement

Amended Document Filed

Amezcua v. Vita-Pakt -- FAC (final-signed).pdf; Comment: First Amended Class Action Complaint

Stipulation and Order filed

Civil Document; Judicial Officer: Simpson, Alan; Comment: for leave to file first amended complaint

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Declaration Filed

Declaration; Comment: Declaration of Jason Borchers iso Def.'s Motion for Peremptory Disqualification

Notice Filed

Notice Filed; Comment: outgoing transfer

Notice Filed

Notice Filed; Comment: Case of Management Conference

75 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment After Conditional Settlement; Judicial Officer: McGuire, Rosemary; Judgment Type: Judgment After Conditional Settlement; Party Names: Amezcua, Cruz; Vita-Pakt Citrus Products Co.; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To:; Amezcua, Cruz; Awarded Against:; Vita-Pakt Citrus Products Co.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • Jury Trial- Judicial Officer: Black, Donald; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment; Comment: Requested by both parties with estimated time of 15-30 days.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • Trial Readiness- Judicial Officer: Black, Donald; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • Mandatory Settlement Conference- Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order Attachment (Tentative Rulings Only)- Civil Document; Comment: Certificate of Mailing Attached

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • Motion - Certify Class Action- Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.; Hearing Time: 3:28 PM; Result: Heard; Comment: Greg Farley

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration Filed- AmezcuavVita-CPT Decl ISO Final Appr.pdf; Comment: Declaration of Kelsey Skey in Support of Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration Filed- AmezcuavVita-Majarian Decl re Final Appr.pdf; Comment: Declaration of Sahag Majarian, II, in Support of Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration Filed- AmezcuavVita-Farley Decl re Final Appr.pdf; Comment: Declaration of Gregg A. Farley in Support of Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration Filed- AmezcuavVita-Amezcua Decl re Final Appr.pdf; Comment: Declaration of Plaintiff Cruz Amezcua in Support of Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement

    Read MoreRead Less
104 More Docket Entries
  • 02/05/2018
  • Financial info for Amezcua, Cruz: Transaction Assessment $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • Financial info for Amezcua, Cruz: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2017-72208 Amezcua, Cruz $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • Financial info for Amezcua, Cruz: Transaction Assessment $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • Financial info for Amezcua, Cruz: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2017-63734 Amezcua, Cruz $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • Financial info for Amezcua, Cruz: Transaction Assessment $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • Financial info for Amezcua, Cruz: Mail Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2017-00020688 Farley; Greg; A. $1000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • Financial info for Amezcua, Cruz: Transaction Assessment $1000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • Financial info for Amezcua, Cruz: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2017-45752 Amezcua, Cruz $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • Financial info for Amezcua, Cruz: Transaction Assessment $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • Financial: Amezcua, Cruz; Total Financial Assessment $1,320.00; Total Payments and Credits $1,320.00

    Read MoreRead Less