This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 04/20/2018 at 09:05:23 (UTC).

Creditors Bureau vs. Craig Dowling

Case Summary

On 02/23/2012 Creditors Bureau filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Craig Dowling. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Clovis Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Ikeda, Dale. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0261

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Clovis Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Ikeda, Dale

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Creditor Bureau USA

Defendants

Dowling, Craig R

Dowling, Zena M

Others

Dowling, Craig

Dowling, Zena

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Suhr, John D.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/23/2012
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Clerk's Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2014
  • Satisfaction of judgment-full- Comment: Acknowledgement of full satisfaction of judgment filed. cs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2014
  • Clerk Cert of Mailing Printed- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CDAEVNT on 14-JUL-2014 by DWARNSHUIS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2014
  • Clerk Cert of Mailing Printed- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CDAEVNT on 14-JUL-2014 by DWARNSHUIS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2014
  • Minute order printed- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CDAEVNT on 11-JUL-2014 by DWARNSHUIS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2014
  • Order of Examination- Judicial Officer: Ikeda, Dale; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2014
  • Order of Examination- Judicial Officer: Ikeda, Dale; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2014
  • OX served, proof filed- Comment: Proof of Service of Order for Examination of judgment Debtor/Third Party, Zena M. Dowling on 5/27/14 served and filed. cg

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2014
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$120.00 was made on receipt CLCE335871.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2014
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$120.00 was made on receipt CLCE335871.

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 02/23/2012
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: cg Event: New Civil Case Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2014
  • Financial info for Dowling, Zena M: Counter Payment Receipt # 335871 Dowling, Craig R $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2014
  • Financial info for Dowling, Zena M: Transaction Assessment $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2014
  • Financial: Dowling, Zena M; Total Financial Assessment $60.00; Total Payments and Credits $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2014
  • Financial info for Dowling, Craig R: Counter Payment Receipt # 335871 Dowling, Craig R $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2014
  • Financial info for Dowling, Craig R: Transaction Assessment $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2014
  • Financial: Dowling, Craig R; Total Financial Assessment $60.00; Total Payments and Credits $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2012
  • Financial info for Creditor Bureau USA: Counter Payment Receipt # 38179 Creditor Bureau USA $181.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2012
  • Financial info for Creditor Bureau USA: Transaction Assessment $181.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2012
  • Financial: Creditor Bureau USA; Total Financial Assessment $181.00; Total Payments and Credits $181.00

    Read MoreRead Less