This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 02/27/2018 at 09:54:17 (UTC).

Creditors Bureau USA vs Michael D Henderson/CC

Case Summary

On 10/27/2011 Creditors Bureau USA filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Michael D Henderson/CC. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Clovis Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1341

  • Filing Date:

    10/27/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Clovis Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Creditors Bureau USA

Defendant

Henderson, Michael D

Others

Henderson, Michael

Henderson Construction

Henderson, Michael David

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Suhr, John D.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/09/2012
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Clerk's Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2012
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$25.00 was made on receipt CLCL37633.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2012
  • Abstract of Judgment issued- Comment: Abstract of Judgment issued. cg

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2012
  • Amended document filed- Comment: Amended Proof of service of summons and complaint filed showing personal service on Michael D. Henderson on 11/23/11 filed. cg

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2012
  • Clerk's default judgment- Comment: Documents in support of judgment filed. Judgment entered on 1/09/12 for plaintiff(s) Creditors Bureau USA against defendant(s) Michael D Henderson in the sum of: Principal: $10449.00 Interest: $ 1300.53 Atty Fees: $ 1000.00 Costs: $ 395.00 Total: $13144.53 cg

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2012
  • Request for Dismissal of Does- Comment: Request for dismissal of doe defendants: Does 1 to 10, inclusive filed and dismissal entered without prejudice. cg

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2012
  • Request to Enter Default filed- Comment: Request to enter default filed. Default entered as to Michael D Henderson aka Michael David Henderson aka Michael Henderson Dba henderson Construction. cg

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2011
  • POS of summons & comp personal- Comment: Proof of service of summons and complaint filed showing personal service on Michael D. Henderson aka Michael Henderson dba Henderson Contruction on 11-23-11 psn .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2011
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$370.00 was made on receipt CLCL37010.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2011
  • JBSIS: New Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2011
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Complaint filed - summons issued . Event: Civil complaint filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2011
  • Civil Case Cove Sheet 3.740- Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. Case designated as a CRC Rule 3.740 Collections Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2011
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Event: New Civil Case Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2012
  • Financial info for Creditors Bureau USA: Counter Payment Receipt # 37633 Creditors Bureau USA $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2012
  • Financial info for Creditors Bureau USA: Transaction Assessment $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2012
  • Financial: Creditors Bureau USA; Total Financial Assessment $25.00; Total Payments and Credits $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.