This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 23:12:19 (UTC).

Creditors Bureau USA vs. Luis Quintero

Case Summary

On 06/02/2017 Creditors Bureau USA filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Luis Quintero. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4252

  • Filing Date:

    06/02/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Creditors Bureau USA

Defendants

Quintero, Julia

Quintero, Luis

Julia Z. Quintero

Luis A. Quintero

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Suhr, John D.

 

Court Documents

Return filed

Return filed; Comment: Return of Writ of Execution filed partially satisfied.$3,037.40

Judgment

Clerk's Default Judgment; Judgment Type: Clerk's Default Judgment; Party Names: Creditors Bureau USA; Quintero, Luis; Quintero, Julia; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To:; Creditors Bureau USA; Awarded Against:; Quintero, Luis; Quintero, Julia; Amount; Damages: $12,408.71; Pre-Judgment Interest: $2,724.32; Attorney Fees: $2,111.31; Costs: $463.00; Total: $17707.34

Writ of Execution Issued

Writ of Execution Issued; Comment: County: Fresno Amount: $17824.52

Abstract of Judgment Issued

Abstract; Comment: Amount: $17707.34

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment Filed

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment Filed; Comment: Costs: $0.00 Credit: $0.00 Interest: $ 92.18

Dismissal of Doe Defendant(s)

Dismissal of Doe Defendant(s); Comment: Without Prejudice Does: 1-10

Request to Enter Default

Request to Enter Default

Judgment Received

CBUSA v LUIS QUINTERO-Judgment.pdf; Comment: Judgment Pending Review

Declaration Filed

CBUSA v LUIS QUINTERO-Decl re Atty Fees.pdf; Comment: Declaration

Declaration Filed

CBUSA v LUIS QUINTERO-Decl re Interest.pdf; Comment: Declaration

Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review

CBUSA v LUIS QUINTERO-Dismissal-DOES.pdf; Comment: Request for Dismissal of Does and Roes

Request for Default Received

CBUSA v LUIS QUINTERO-Req for Default.pdf; Comment: with Judgment

Proof of Service

CBUSA v LUIS QUINTERO-Proof of Service-2.pdf

Proof of Service

CBUSA v LUIS QUINTERO-Proof of Service-1.pdf

Summons issued and filed

Summons issued and filed

Civil Complaint filed

Civil Complaint filed

Civil case cover sheet

Civil case cover sheet

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Clerk's Default Judgment; Judgment Type: Clerk's Default Judgment; Party Names: Creditors Bureau USA; Quintero, Luis; Quintero, Julia; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To:; Creditors Bureau USA; Awarded Against:; Quintero, Luis; Quintero, Julia; Amount; Damages: $12,408.71; Pre-Judgment Interest: $2,724.32; Attorney Fees: $2,111.31; Costs: $463.00; Total: $17707.34

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Return filed- Return filed; Comment: Return of Writ of Execution filed partially satisfied.$3,037.40

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Execution Issued- Writ of Execution Issued; Comment: County: Fresno Amount: $17824.52

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Abstract of Judgment Issued- Abstract; Comment: Amount: $17707.34

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Costs After Judgment Filed- Memorandum of Costs After Judgment Filed; Comment: Costs: $0.00 Credit: $0.00 Interest: $ 92.18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Dismissal of Doe Defendant(s)- Dismissal of Doe Defendant(s); Comment: Without Prejudice Does: 1-10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request to Enter Default- Request to Enter Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Judgment Received- CBUSA v LUIS QUINTERO-Judgment.pdf; Comment: Judgment Pending Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration Filed- CBUSA v LUIS QUINTERO-Decl re Atty Fees.pdf; Comment: Declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration Filed- CBUSA v LUIS QUINTERO-Decl re Interest.pdf; Comment: Declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 06/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service- CBUSA v LUIS QUINTERO-Proof of Service-2.pdf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service- CBUSA v LUIS QUINTERO-Proof of Service-1.pdf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed- Summons issued and filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Complaint filed- Civil Complaint filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil case cover sheet- Civil case cover sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • Financial info for Creditors Bureau USA: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2017-53817 Creditors Bureau USA $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • Financial info for Creditors Bureau USA: Transaction Assessment $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • Financial info for Creditors Bureau USA: Mail Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2017-00013962 Creditors Bureau USA $370.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • Financial info for Creditors Bureau USA: Transaction Assessment $370.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • Financial: Creditors Bureau USA; Total Financial Assessment $420.00; Total Payments and Credits $420.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Creditors Bureau USA is a litigant