This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 06/08/2022 at 17:07:06 (UTC).

County of Fresno vs.Paloo, LLC

Case Summary

On 03/29/2016 County of Fresno filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against Paloo, LLC. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Fresno County BF Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Dalesandro, Samuel. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1053

  • Filing Date:

    03/29/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Dalesandro, Samuel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

County of Fresno

Defendants

Paloo, LLC

Fifth Wheel Truck Stop % R Bhullar

 

Court Documents

Request for Judgment - Tax

Request for Judgment - Tax; Comment: Tax collector's certificate and request for judgment against Paloo, LLC and notice of entry of judgment by clerk. Action#: T-162128140

Application and Order for Examination

Order of Examination from Another Court

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment Filed

Memorandum of Costs; Comment: Memorandum of Costs

Writ of Execution Issued

Writ of Execution Issued; Comment: County: Fresno Amount: $6,812.72

Judgment

Clerks Judgment Entered - Tax Collector; Judgment Type: Clerks Judgment Entered - Tax Collector; Party Names: County of Fresno; Paloo, LLC; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To:; County of Fresno; Judgment Amount: $5,993.92; Awarded Against:; Paloo, LLC; Status: Granted; Status Date: 03/29/2016; Status Comment: T-16128140

Request for Judgment - Tax

03/29/2016: Request for Judgment - Tax

Order of Examination from Another Court

10/24/2016: Order of Examination from Another Court

Minute Order Attachment

01/06/2017: Minute Order Attachment

Memorandum of Costs

06/09/2017: Memorandum of Costs

Writ of Execution Issued

06/09/2017: Writ of Execution Issued

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued; Comment: County: Fresno Amount: $6,812.72

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs After Judgment Filed; Comment: Memorandum of Costs

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order Attachment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2017
  • DocketOrder of Examination; Judicial Officer: Dalesandro, Samuel; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard; Comment: Toni Macias

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication and Order for Examination

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2016
  • FinancialFinancial info for County of Fresno: Government Exemption Claimed $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2016
  • FinancialFinancial info for County of Fresno: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2016
  • FinancialFinancial: County of Fresno; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2016
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judgment Type: Clerks Judgment Entered - Tax Collector; Party; Names: County of Fresno; Paloo, LLC; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To; County of Fresno; Awarded Against; Paloo, LLC; Judgment Amount: $5,993.92; Status: Granted; Status Date: 03/29/2016; Status Comment: T-16128140; Status Comment: T-16128140

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Judgment - Tax; Comment: Tax collector's certificate and request for judgment against Paloo, LLC and notice of entry of judgment by clerk. Action#: T-162128140

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Fifth Wheel Truck Stop and Paloo, LLC is a litigant