This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/12/2018 at 17:35:46 (UTC).

County of Fresno vs. Kristine Belardes

Case Summary

On 06/16/2016 County of Fresno filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Kristine Belardes. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Dalesandro, Samuel, Diaz, Monica and Snauffer, Mark. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1933

  • Filing Date:

    06/16/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Dalesandro, Samuel

Diaz, Monica

Snauffer, Mark

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

County of Fresno

Defendants

Belardes, Anthony M.

Belardes, Abel

Belardes, Arthur C.

Belardes, Adam

Belardes, Benita

Belardes, Michael A.J.

A.K.J. Properties

Perez-Belardes, Martha H.

Belardes, Adrian J.

Belardes, Nicholas L.

Humphrey, Alison Belardes

Belardes, Kristine A.

Belardes, Marcus J.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Hawkins, Scott C.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Hearing

Civil Document; Comment: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGE FOR ALL PURPOSES

Notice Filed

Notice; Comment: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt - Alison Belardes Humphrey

Notice Filed

Notice; Comment: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt Civil

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Notice Filed

Notice Filed; Comment: Acknowledgment of Receipt signed by Nicholas L Belardes

Notice Filed

Notice; Comment: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt - Anthony M. Belardes

Notice Filed

Notice; Comment: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt - Adrian John Belardes

Notice Filed

Notice; Comment: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt - Kristine Belardes

Notice of Motion

Notice of Motion; Comment: and Motion to: Discharge After Complaint and Deposit in Interpleader

Civil case cover sheet

Civil Document

Notice Filed

Notice; Comment: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt - Nicholas Belardes

Notice Filed

Notice; Comment: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt - Abel Belardes

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Notice Filed

Notice; Comment: Notice and Acknowlegdment of Receipt - Marcus J. Belardes

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Civil Complaint filed

Civil Document

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Notice Filed

Notice; Comment: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt - AKJ Properties

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2018
  • Order to Show Cause - Pre- Judicial Officer: Diaz, Monica; Hearing Time: 8:32 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • General Motion- Judicial Officer: Snauffer, Mark; Hearing Time: 3:28 PM; Comment: discharge after interpleader; Scott Hawkins

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • Order to Show Cause - Pre- Judicial Officer: Diaz, Monica; Hearing Time: 9:32 AM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • Government Exemption Claimed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Motion- Notice of Motion; Comment: and Motion to: Discharge After Complaint and Deposit in Interpleader

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2017
  • 60-Day Continued OSC- Judicial Officer: Dalesandro, Samuel; Hearing Time: 9:31 AM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice Filed- Notice; Comment: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt Civil

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice Filed- Notice; Comment: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt - Arthur C Belardes

    Read MoreRead Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 06/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing- Civil Document; Comment: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGE FOR ALL PURPOSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed- Civil Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2016
  • Government Exemption Claimed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Complaint filed- Civil Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil case cover sheet- Civil Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • Financial info for County of Fresno: Government Exemption Claimed $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • Financial info for County of Fresno: Transaction Assessment $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2016
  • Financial info for County of Fresno: Government Exemption Claimed $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2016
  • Financial info for County of Fresno: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2016
  • Financial: County of Fresno; Total Financial Assessment $495.00; Total Payments and Credits $495.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.