Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 02/26/2018 at 15:09:57 (UTC).

XXXXX

Case Summary

On 06/10/2011 XXXXX was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Smith, M, Smith, Bruce, Ikeda, Dale and Smith, M. Bruce. The case status is Other - Consolidated.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2020

  • Filing Date:

    06/10/2011

  • Case Status:

    Other - Consolidated

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Smith, M

Smith, Bruce

Ikeda, Dale

Smith, M. Bruce

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Soto, Juan A

Defendants

Sierra Kings District Hospital

Sierra Kings Womens Health Center

Cano M.D., Miguel

Medina P.A., Julie

Bank of America, National Association

National Association, a Calif Corp

Cano, Miguel, Medical Doctor

Medina, Julie

Minor

XXXXX

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Wagner, Nicholas

1111 East Herndon Suite 317 Wagner & Jones

Fresno, CA 93720

Defendant Attorneys

Weiss, Andrew R.

Weiss, Martin, Salinas &Hearst 7108 N. Fresno Suite 250

Fresno, CA 93720

Beltramo, Mario L., JR

Pelliconi, Bethany A

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/12/2013
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Order Consolidating Actions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2014
  • Jury Trial- Original Type: Jury Trial; Judicial Officer: Smith, Bruce; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Off Calendar; Comment: Jones lp

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2014
  • Trial Readiness- Original Type: Trial Readiness; Judicial Officer: Smith, Bruce; Hearing Time: 09:30 AM; Result: Off Calendar; Comment: Jones lp

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2014
  • Mandatory Settlement Conference- Original Type: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Judicial Officer: Judge, Pro Tempore; Hearing Time: 01:30 PM; Result: Off Calendar; Comment: Jones lp

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2013
  • Off calendar- Comment: Off calendar for Trial scheduled for 8-25-14. Consolidated gar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2013
  • Off calendar- Comment: Off calendar for Trial Readiness scheduled for 8-22-14. Consolidated gar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2013
  • Off calendar- Comment: Off calendar for msc scheduled for 7-30-14. Consolidated gar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2013
  • Order consolidating actions- Comment: Order consolidating actions signed by Judge Smith filed. Lead case: 11CECG02019 Non-lead cases: 11CECG02020 gar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2013
  • OSC - ADR Stipulation- Original Type: OSC - ADR Stipulation; Judicial Officer: Ikeda, Dale; Hearing Time: 10:07 AM; Result: Off Calendar; Comment: Jones lp

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2013
  • Notice filed- Comment: Notice of motion to consolidate with 11CECG02019 filed. dhouston

    Read MoreRead Less
102 More Docket Entries
  • 05/02/2013
  • Financial info for Sierra Kings District Hospital: Counter Payment Receipt # 177409 Sierra Kings District Hospital $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2013
  • Financial info for Sierra Kings District Hospital: Transaction Assessment $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2012
  • Financial info for Sierra Kings District Hospital: Counter Payment Receipt # 172165 Sierra Kings District Hospital $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2012
  • Financial info for Sierra Kings District Hospital: Transaction Assessment $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2012
  • Financial: Sierra Kings District Hospital; Total Financial Assessment $300.00; Total Payments and Credits $300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2013
  • Financial info for Soto, Juan A: Counter Payment Receipt # 177866 Soto, Juan A $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2013
  • Financial info for Soto, Juan A: Transaction Assessment $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2011
  • Financial info for Soto, Juan A: Counter Payment Receipt # 153600 Soto, Juan A $395.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2011
  • Financial info for Soto, Juan A: Transaction Assessment $395.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2011
  • Financial: Soto, Juan A; Total Financial Assessment $545.00; Total Payments and Credits $545.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Sierra Kings Women's Health Center, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where XXXXX is a litigant

Latest cases where Bank of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PELLICONI BETHANY A.