Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/06/2018 at 16:29:08 (UTC).

CONSOLIDATED W/13CECG03829

Case Summary

On 01/07/2014 CONSOLIDATED W/13CECG03829 was filed as a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Smith, Bruce and Smith, M. Bruce. The case status is Other - Consolidated.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0059

  • Filing Date:

    01/07/2014

  • Case Status:

    Other - Consolidated

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Smith, Bruce

Smith, M. Bruce

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Noyola, Yolinda

Defendants

Adventist Medical Center-Reedley

Adventist Health System/West

Adventist Health/Central Valley Network

Cano M.D., Miguel Angel

Shirer M.D., Amy E.

Hoover, Rodney F.

CRNA

Thorpe, D, Registered Nurse

Bayardo, Carlos Francisco, Medical Doctor

Shirer, Amy E., Medical Doctor

Sierra Kings Women's Health Center Inc

Cano, Miguel Angel, Medical Doctor

Sierra Kings Women's Health Center

Omni Anesthesia Associates, Inc.

Rodney F. Hoover, CRNA

Meirabela, P, Registered Nurse

Freeman, D., Registered Nurse

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Binion, James

1100 West Shaw Avenue, Ste 124

Fresno, CA 93711

Moeck, David M.

Defendant Attorneys

White, William M.

Weiss, Andrew R.

Reinholtz, Jack R.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/27/2014
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Order Consolidating Actions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2015
  • Demurrer- Original Type: Demurrer; Hearing Time: 3:27 PM; Result: Off Calendar; Comment: William White 432-5400 per Rendia dhouston

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2015
  • Off calendar- Comment: Off calendar for demurrer scheduled for 2/25/15. Set in non lead case in error. Reset in 13CECG03829. dhouston

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2014
  • 60-Day Continued CMC- Original Type: 60-Day Continued CMC; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2014
  • Demurrer- Original Type: Demurrer; Judicial Officer: Smith, Bruce; Hearing Time: 03:27 PM; Result: Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2014
  • Motion to Consolidate- Original Type: Motion to Consolidate; Judicial Officer: Smith, Bruce; Hearing Time: 3:27 PM; Result: Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2014
  • Off calendar- Comment: Off calendar for CMC scheduled for 7-14-14. Consolidated gar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2014
  • Off calendar- Comment: Off calendar for demurrer scheduled for 6-19-14. Consolidated gar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2014
  • Off calendar- Comment: Off calendar for Motion to consolidate scheduled for 6-10-14. Consolidated gar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2014
  • Order consolidating actions- Comment: Order consolidating actions signed by Judge Smith filed. Lead case: 13CECG03829 Non-lead cases: 14CECG00059 gar

    Read MoreRead Less
57 More Docket Entries
  • 05/15/2014
  • Financial: Adventist Health/Central Valley Network; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2014
  • Financial info for Adventist Health System/West: Counter Payment Receipt # 190359 Adventist Medical Center-Reedley $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2014
  • Financial info for Adventist Health System/West: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2014
  • Financial: Adventist Health System/West; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2014
  • Financial info for Adventist Medical Center-Reedley: Counter Payment Receipt # 190359 Adventist Medical Center-Reedley $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2014
  • Financial info for Adventist Medical Center-Reedley: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2014
  • Financial: Adventist Medical Center-Reedley; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2014
  • Financial info for Noyola, Yolinda: Counter Payment Receipt # 185825 Noyola, Yolinda $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2014
  • Financial info for Noyola, Yolinda: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2014
  • Financial: Noyola, Yolinda; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Omni Anesthesia Associates Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Sierra Kings Women's Health Center, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where CRNA is a litigant