This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 06/17/2022 at 12:59:00 (UTC).

TRANSFERRED TO SACRAMENTO COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT Commercial Trade, Inc. vs. Griffin Electric, Inc.

Case Summary

On 11/20/2017 TRANSFERRED TO SACRAMENTO COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT Commercial Trade, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Griffin Electric, Inc. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Dalesandro, Samuel, McGuire, Rosemary, Black, Donald, Simpson, Alan, Pebet, Noelle, Diaz, Monica and Cabrera, Carlos. The case status is Other - Transferred.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9686

  • Filing Date:

    11/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other - Transferred

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Dalesandro, Samuel

McGuire, Rosemary

Black, Donald

Simpson, Alan

Pebet, Noelle

Diaz, Monica

Cabrera, Carlos

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Commercial Trade, Inc.

Defendant

Griffin Electric, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

McCormack, Sandra Kuhn

Defendant Attorney

PETERSON, ROLLIE A

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: On 12/17/18 the PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITIONS TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO CHANGE VENUE; DECLARATION OF HAL ENNIS was mailed to Rollie A. Peterson, Esq

Notice Filed

HRG 11-13-18 Notice Appear by Phone.pdf; Comment: HRG 11/13/18 Notice of intent to Appear by Phone

Notice Filed

Not. of Phone Appearance.pdf; Comment: Notice

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Declaration Filed

Peterson Dec.pdf; Comment: Declaration

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: On 12/13/18 the Stipulation regarding alternative dispute resolution (ADR) mailed to Rollie A Peterosn

Declaration Filed

Declaration; Comment: Rollie A Peterson, Esq., in Support of Defendant Griffin Electric, Inc.'s Motion to Change Venue

Notice Filed

Notice Filed; Comment: of Transfer of Papers and Pleadings

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: Case Management Statement

Receipt filed

06/11/2019: Receipt filed

Notice Filed

03/07/2019: Notice Filed

Not. Entry of Order.pdf

02/05/2019: Not. Entry of Order.pdf

Civil Document

01/17/2019: Civil Document

Minute Order Attachment

01/17/2019: Minute Order Attachment

HRG 1-17-19 Objections.pdf

01/10/2019: HRG 1-17-19 Objections.pdf

HRG 1-17-19 Peterson Declaration.pdf

01/10/2019: HRG 1-17-19 Peterson Declaration.pdf

HRG 1-17-19 Griffin Declaration.pdf

01/10/2019: HRG 1-17-19 Griffin Declaration.pdf

HRG 1-17-19 Reply Brief.pdf

01/10/2019: HRG 1-17-19 Reply Brief.pdf

99 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketJury Trial; Judicial Officer: Black, Donald; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Off Calendar; Comment: Jury Req by both; 2-3 Days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketTrial Readiness; Judicial Officer: McGuire, Rosemary; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReceipt filed; Comment: For Transfer of Documents received from: Sacramento Superior Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judgment Type: Transferred Case to:; Party; Names: Commercial Trade, Inc.; Griffin Electric, Inc.; Comment: Sacramento County

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Filed; Comment: of Transfer of Papers and Pleadings

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for Griffin Electric, Inc.: Mail Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2019-00002832 PETERSON, ROLLIE A $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for Griffin Electric, Inc.: Transaction Assessment $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Filed; Comment: HRG 1/17/19 Notice of Entry??of Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • DocketOSC - ADR Stipulation; Judicial Officer: Dalesandro, Samuel; Hearing Time: 8:37 AM; Cancel Reason: Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
65 More Docket Entries
  • 02/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • DocketSummons and Complaint; Served: 12/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Comment: Notice of CMC Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • FinancialFinancial info for Commercial Trade, Inc.: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2017-68389 COMMERCIAL TRADE, INC. $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • FinancialFinancial info for Commercial Trade, Inc.: Transaction Assessment $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • FinancialFinancial: Commercial Trade, Inc.; Total Financial Assessment $295.00; Total Payments and Credits $295.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GRIFFIN ELECTRIC, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where COMMERCIAL TRADE, INC. is a litigant