This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/13/2018 at 07:59:38 (UTC).

Commercial Trade, Inc. vs. Clovis Body & Paint, LLC.

Case Summary

On 10/06/2016 Commercial Trade, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Clovis Body Paint, LLC. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Cullers, Mark. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8048

  • Filing Date:

    10/06/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Cullers, Mark

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Commercial Trade, Inc.

Defendants

Yee, Colin K

Clovis Body & Paint, LLC.

Alfa Towing

Houts, Vickie Kay

Clovis Body & Paint

Houts, Thomas Franklin

Lim, Mimi Y.

Houts, Tommy

Yee, Aaron

Yee, Andrew L.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

McCormack, Sandra Kuhn

 

Court Documents

Judgment

Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: Lim, Mimi Y.; Comment: With prejudice

Judgment

Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: Yee, Colin K; Comment: With prejudice

Judgment

Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: Yee, Andrew L.; Comment: With prejudice

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: Notice of Entry of Dismissal

Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review

Request for Partial Dismissal

Case Management Statement Filed

Case Management Statement Filed

Dismissal of Doe Defendant(s)

Dismissal of Doe Defendant(s); Comment: Without Prejudice Does: 1 through 10

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: as to Aaron Yee

Notice of Hearing

Civil Document; Comment: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Writ of Execution Issued

Writ of Execution Issued; Comment: County: Kern Amount: $3198.15

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment Filed

Memorandum of Costs; Comment: Costs: $56.00 Credit: $1800.00 Interest: $ 142.00

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: Notice of Entry of Dismissal

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: Notice of Entry of Dismissal

Abstract of Judgment Issued

Abstract; Comment: Amount: $4,775.15

Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review

Request for Partial Dismissal

Order Received for Signature

Application; Comment: Forwarded to Dept: Clerks office for further processing Order for: set aside judgment

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: as to Thomas Franklin Houts

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: as to Vickie Kay Houts

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: Lim, Mimi Y.; Comment: With prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: Yee, Colin K; Comment: With prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: Yee, Andrew L.; Comment: With prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: Yee, Aaron; Comment: With prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Clerk's Default Judgment; Judgment Type: Clerk's Default Judgment; Party Names: Commercial Trade, Inc.; Clovis Body & Paint, LLC.; Houts, Thomas Franklin; Houts, Vickie Kay; Yee, Aaron; Yee, Colin K; Lim, Mimi Y.; Yee, Andrew L.; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To:; Commercial Trade, Inc.; Awarded Against:; Clovis Body & Paint, LLC.; Houts, Thomas Franklin; Houts, Vickie Kay; Yee, Aaron; Yee, Colin K; Lim, Mimi Y.; Yee, Andrew L.; Amount; Damages: $3,069.08; Pre-Judgment Interest: $380.76; Attorney Fees: $613.81; Costs: $711.50; Total: $4775.15; Comment: **Judgment set aside as to deft. Aaron Yee; Colin K Yee; Mimi Y Lim all ind & all dba Clovis Body & Paint aka Clovis Auto Body and Andrew L Yee ind & DBA Alfa Towing per order signed 07/10/17**

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Execution Issued- Writ of Execution Issued; Comment: County: Kern Amount: $3198.15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Costs After Judgment Filed- Memorandum of Costs; Comment: Costs: $56.00 Credit: $1800.00 Interest: $ 142.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service- Proof of Service; Comment: Notice of Entry of Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service- Proof of Service; Comment: Notice of Entry of Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service- Proof of Service; Comment: Notice of Entry of Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
34 More Docket Entries
  • 10/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed- Civil Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Complaint filed- Civil Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil case cover sheet- Civil Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • Financial info for Commercial Trade, Inc.: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2017-44751 Commercial Trade, Inc. $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • Financial info for Commercial Trade, Inc.: Transaction Assessment $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • Financial info for Commercial Trade, Inc.: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2017-36997 Commercial Trade, Inc. $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • Financial info for Commercial Trade, Inc.: Transaction Assessment $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2016
  • Financial info for Commercial Trade, Inc.: Mail Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2016-00034258 Commercial Trade, Inc. $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2016
  • Financial info for Commercial Trade, Inc.: Transaction Assessment $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2016
  • Financial: Commercial Trade, Inc.; Total Financial Assessment $275.00; Total Payments and Credits $275.00

    Read MoreRead Less