This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 04/08/2018 at 01:54:17 (UTC).

Colorado Capital v Kristi L Daffron Court cc

Case Summary

On 09/04/2009 Colorado Capital filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Kristi L Daffron Court cc. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Clovis Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Fain, Gregory. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1366

  • Filing Date:

    09/04/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Clovis Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Fain, Gregory

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Colorado Capital Investments, Inc

Defendant

Daffron-Gort, Kristi L

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Patenaude, Victor

 

Court Documents

Writ of Execution Issued

Writ of Execution Issued; Comment: County: Los Angeles Amount: $4,080.26

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment Filed

Memorandum of Costs; Comment: Costs: $0 Credit: $0 Interest: $1,791.18

Writ of Execution Issued

Writ of Execution Issued; Comment: County: Fresno Amount: 3,701.44

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment Filed

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment Filed; Comment: Costs: $ 0.00 Credit: $ 1,412.36 Interest: $ 0.00

Writ of Execution Issued

Writ of Execution Issued; Comment: County: San Diego Amount: $3,701.44

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment Filed

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment Filed; Comment: Costs: $0.00 Credit: $0.00 Interest: $ 1412.36

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/18/2009
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Clerk's Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Execution Issued- Writ of Execution Issued; Comment: County: Los Angeles Amount: $4,080.26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Costs After Judgment Filed- Memorandum of Costs; Comment: Costs: $0 Credit: $0 Interest: $1,791.18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Execution Issued- Writ of Execution Issued; Comment: County: Fresno Amount: 3,701.44

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Costs After Judgment Filed- Memorandum of Costs After Judgment Filed; Comment: Costs: $ 0.00 Credit: $ 1,412.36 Interest: $ 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Execution Issued- Writ of Execution Issued; Comment: County: San Diego Amount: $3,701.44

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Costs After Judgment Filed- Memorandum of Costs After Judgment Filed; Comment: Costs: $0.00 Credit: $0.00 Interest: $ 1412.36

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2013
  • Returned documents letter- Comment: Documents returned: Writ and check #307089 Reason: Judgment debtor's name does not match. Date: 2-20-13 lv

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2013
  • Memo of costs after judgment- Comment: Memorandum of costs after judgment, acknowledgement of credits and declaration of accrued interest filed. Credit: $0 Interest: $713.62 Costs: $0 lv

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2010
  • Collection Case Review- Original Type: Collection Case Review; Judicial Officer: Fain, Gregory; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 09/10/2009
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Complaint filed - summons issued . Event: Civil complaint filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2009
  • JBSIS: New Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2009
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Event: New Civil Case Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • Financial info for Colorado Capital Investments, Inc: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2017-72928 Colorado Capital Investments, Inc $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • Financial info for Colorado Capital Investments, Inc: Transaction Assessment $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2016
  • Financial info for Colorado Capital Investments, Inc: Mail Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2016-00013982 Electronic Document Processing $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2016
  • Financial info for Colorado Capital Investments, Inc: Transaction Assessment $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2016
  • Financial info for Colorado Capital Investments, Inc: Mail Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2016-00013145 Colorado Capital Investments, Inc $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2016
  • Financial info for Colorado Capital Investments, Inc: Transaction Assessment $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2016
  • Financial: Colorado Capital Investments, Inc; Total Financial Assessment $75.00; Total Payments and Credits $75.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.