This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/13/2018 at 07:04:10 (UTC).

Collectronics, Inc. vs. Mateo Days Limited Partnership, a California Limited Partnership

Case Summary

On 09/29/2016 Collectronics, Inc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Mateo Days Limited Partnership, a California Limited Partnership. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Dalesandro, Samuel. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7849

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Dalesandro, Samuel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Collectronics, Inc.

Defendants

Pardini, John

Mateo Days Limited Partnership, a California Limited Partnership

Rose Days, L.P., a California Limited Partnership

TGI Fridays Roseville

Coop Days L-Pship, a California Limited Partnership

as General Partner of Coop Days L-Pship

as General Partner of Mateo Days Limited Partnership

Stripes Restaurants, Inc.

Individually as General Partner of Coop Days L-Pship

TGI Fridays

as General Partner of Rose Days, L.P.

Pardini, Robert

Individually as General Partnerof Mateo Days Limited Partnership

Individually as General Partner of Mateo Days Limited Partnership

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Pollard, Ralph L

 

Court Documents

Letter of Documents Returned Without Filing

Letter of Documents Returned Without Filing; Comment: Please note effective July 1st, 20I7, documents filed by represented parties in all Limited Civil actions must be filed electronicially. Visit our website for more information: http://www.fresno.courts.ca.gov.

Request for Default Received

Request for Court Judgment; Comment: With Judgment

Order Denied

Order Denied; Judicial Officer: Dalesandro, Samuel; Comment: See scanned Order

Request to Enter Default

Request to Enter Default

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: Robert Pardini

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: John Pardini, Individually as General Partner of Mateo Days Limited Partnership

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: Mateo Days Limited Partnership

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: John Pardini, individually as general partner of Coop Days L-PSHIP

Civil Complaint filed

Civil Document

Judgment

Default Judgment by Court; Judicial Officer: Dalesandro, Samuel; Judgment Type: Default Judgment by Court; Party Names: Collectronics, Inc.; Mateo Days Limited Partnership, a California Limited Partnership; Stripes Restaurants, Inc.; Pardini, Robert; Pardini, John; Coop Days L-Pship, a California Limited Partnership; Stripes Restaurants, Inc.; Pardini, John; Rose Days, L.P., a California Limited Partnership; Stripes Restaurants, Inc.; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To:; Collectronics, Inc.; Awarded Against:; Mateo Days Limited Partnership, a California Limited Partnership; Stripes Restaurants, Inc.; Pardini, Robert; Coop Days L-Pship, a California Limited Partnership; Stripes Restaurants, Inc.; Rose Days, L.P., a California Limited Partnership; Stripes Restaurants, Inc.; Pardini, John; Pardini, John; Amount; Damages: $5,985.12; Pre-Judgment Interest Rate: 24.00 %; Pre-Judgment Interest: $2,423.10; Attorney Fees: $848.00; Costs: $566.50; Total: $9822.72

Order Granted

Order Granted; Judicial Officer: Dalesandro, Samuel; Comment: See Scanned Order

Order Received for Signature

Declaration; Comment: Forwarded Clerks office for further processing 9/27/17

Declaration Filed

Declaration

Judgment Received

Judgment; Comment: Forwarded Clerks office for further processing 9/27/17

Dismissal of Doe Defendant(s)

Dismissal of Doe Defendant(s); Comment: Without Prejudice Does: 1-10

Declaration Filed

Declaration Filed; Comment: computation of interest

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: Coop Days L Pship, a California Limited Partnership, DBA TGI Fridays

Summons issued and filed

Civil Document

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Default Judgment by Court; Judicial Officer: Dalesandro, Samuel; Judgment Type: Default Judgment by Court; Party Names: Collectronics, Inc.; Mateo Days Limited Partnership, a California Limited Partnership; Stripes Restaurants, Inc.; Pardini, Robert; Pardini, John; Coop Days L-Pship, a California Limited Partnership; Stripes Restaurants, Inc.; Pardini, John; Rose Days, L.P., a California Limited Partnership; Stripes Restaurants, Inc.; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To:; Collectronics, Inc.; Awarded Against:; Mateo Days Limited Partnership, a California Limited Partnership; Stripes Restaurants, Inc.; Pardini, Robert; Coop Days L-Pship, a California Limited Partnership; Stripes Restaurants, Inc.; Rose Days, L.P., a California Limited Partnership; Stripes Restaurants, Inc.; Pardini, John; Pardini, John; Amount; Damages: $5,985.12; Pre-Judgment Interest Rate: 24.00 %; Pre-Judgment Interest: $2,423.10; Attorney Fees: $848.00; Costs: $566.50; Total: $9822.72

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Letter of Documents Returned Without Filing- Letter of Documents Returned Without Filing; Comment: The document(s) received via mail are being returned unprocessed. Please note effective July 1st, 20I7, documents filed by represented parties in all Limited Civil actions must be filed electronicially. Visit our website for more information: http://www.fresno.courts.ca.gov.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Letter of Documents Returned Without Filing- Letter of Documents Returned Without Filing; Comment: Please note effective July 1st, 20I7, documents filed by represented parties in all Limited Civil actions must be filed electronicially. Visit our website for more information: http://www.fresno.courts.ca.gov.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Order Granted- Order Granted; Judicial Officer: Dalesandro, Samuel; Comment: See Scanned Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • Chambers Work- Pre- Judicial Officer: Dalesandro, Samuel; Hearing Time: 5:30 PM; Result: Chambers Work - Order Submitted for Consideration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • Chambers Work- Pre- Judicial Officer: Dalesandro, Samuel; Hearing Time: 5:30 PM; Result: Chambers Work - Order Submitted for Consideration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Court Judgment- Request for Court Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Order Received for Signature- Declaration; Comment: Forwarded Clerks office for further processing 9/27/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration Filed- Declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Default Received- Request for Court Judgment; Comment: With Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 12/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service- Proof of Service; Comment: John Pardini, Individually as General Partner of Mateo Days Limited Partnership

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service- Proof of Service; Comment: Stripes Restaurants, Inc as General Partner of Mateo Days Limited Partnership

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service- Proof of Service; Comment: Mateo Days Limited Partnership

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service- Proof of Service; Comment: John Pardini, individually as general partner of Coop Days L-PSHIP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed- Civil Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Complaint filed- Civil Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil case cover sheet- Civil Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2016
  • Financial info for Collectronics, Inc.: Mail Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2016-00033468 Great Western Collection Bureau $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2016
  • Financial info for Collectronics, Inc.: Transaction Assessment $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2016
  • Financial: Collectronics, Inc.; Total Financial Assessment $225.00; Total Payments and Credits $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less