This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 08/05/2019 at 23:12:22 (UTC).

Collectibles Management Resources vs. Jorge Ramos Ortega

Case Summary

On 06/15/2018 a Contract - Debt Collection case was filed by Collectibles Management Resources against Jorge Ramos Ortega in the jurisdiction of Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6110

  • Filing Date:

    06/15/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Cullers, Mark

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Collectibles Management Resources

Defendant

Ortega, Jorge Ramos

 

Court Documents

Judgment

Default Judgment by Court; Judicial Officer: Pebet, Noelle; Judgment Type: Default Judgment by Court; Party Names: Collectibles Management Resources; Ortega, Jorge Ramos; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To:; Collectibles Management Resources; Awarded Against:; Ortega, Jorge Ramos; Amount; Damages: $2,322.65; Pre-Judgment Interest Rate: 10.00 %; Pre-Judgment Interest: $620.49; Attorney Fees: $247.70; Costs: $10.80; Total: $3201.64

Request for Default Received

Request for Entry of Default; Comment: Without Judgment

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Declaration Filed

Declaration; Comment: re: code of civil procedure

Civil Complaint filed

Complaint

Summons issued and filed

Summons; Summons issued and filed

Summons issued and filed

Summons; Summons issued and filed

Declaration of Reduced Filing Fee Filed

Declaration

Civil case cover sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Judgment Received

Judgment; Comment: Forward to: Dept 404 on 5/10/2019

Declaration Filed

Declaration; Comment: CCP 585(d)

Request for Court Judgment

Request for Court Judgment

Request for Court Judgment

Request for Court Judgment; Comment: Against: Jorge Ramos Ortega

Order Denied

Order Denied; Judicial Officer: Cullers, Mark; Comment: Order Denying Application for Default Judgment

Judgment Received

Judgment; Comment: Forward to: Dept 404 on 3/15/19

Declaration Filed

Declaration; Comment: Donna Kelley

Request for Default Received

Request for Court Judgment; Comment: With Judgment

Request to Enter Default

Request to Enter Default

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Default Judgment by Court; Judicial Officer: Pebet, Noelle; Judgment Type: Default Judgment by Court; Party Names: Collectibles Management Resources; Ortega, Jorge Ramos; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To:; Collectibles Management Resources; Awarded Against:; Ortega, Jorge Ramos; Amount; Damages: $2,322.65; Pre-Judgment Interest Rate: 10.00 %; Pre-Judgment Interest: $620.49; Attorney Fees: $247.70; Costs: $10.80; Total: $3201.64

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • Chambers Work- Pre- Judicial Officer: Pebet, Noelle; Hearing Time: 5:30 PM; Result: Chambers Work - Order Submitted for Consideration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Judgment Received- Judgment; Comment: Forward to: Dept 404 on 5/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration Filed- Declaration; Comment: CCP 585(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration Filed- Declaration; Comment: CCP 585(b)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Court Judgment- Request for Court Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Order Denied- Order Denied; Judicial Officer: Pebet, Noelle; Comment: See scanned Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • Chambers Work- Pre- Judicial Officer: Pebet, Noelle; Hearing Time: 5:30 PM; Result: Chambers Work - Order Submitted for Consideration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Judgment Received- Judgment; Comment: Forward to: Dept 404 on 4/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration Filed- Declaration; Comment: Donna Hankins in Lieu of Personal Testimony CCP 585(b) (d)

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 08/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Default Received- Request for Entry of Default; Comment: Without Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service- Proof of Service; Comment: Jorge Ramos Ortega

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration Filed- Declaration; Comment: re: code of civil procedure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Complaint filed- Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed- Summons; Summons issued and filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration of Reduced Filing Fee Filed- Declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil case cover sheet- Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2018
  • Financial info for Collectibles Management Resources: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2018-43902 Collectibles Management Resources $181.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2018
  • Financial info for Collectibles Management Resources: Transaction Assessment $181.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2018
  • Financial: Collectibles Management Resources; Total Financial Assessment $181.00; Total Payments and Credits $181.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

PLD-C-001

SHORT TITLE: CASE NUMBER:

COLLECTIBLES VS ORTEGA

4. (Continued) b. The true names of defendants sued as Does are unknown to plaintiff.

(1) L] Doe defendants (specify Doe numbers): — were the agents or employees of the named defendants and acted within the scope of that agency or employment.

(2) [ Doe defendants (specify Doe numbers): — _____ arepersons whose capacities are unknown to plaintiff.

c. [ Information about additional defendants who are not natural persons is contained in Attachment 4c. d. [J] Defendants who are joined under Code of Civil Procedure section 382 are(names):

5. [ Plaintiff is required to comply with a claims statute, and a. (] has complied with applicable claims statutes, or b. ] is excused from complying because (specify) :

6. [X] This action is subjectto [X] Civil Code section 1812.10 [ Civil Code section 2984.4.

7. This court is the proper court because ] a defendant entered into the contract here. (1 a defendant lived here when the contract was entered into. X1 a defendant lives here now. ] the contract was to be performed here. (] adefendant is a corporation or unincorporated association and its principal place of business is here. ] real property that is the subject of this action is located here. X other (specify) : SERVICES WERE RENDERED HERE.

@ "o oo U

8. The following causes of action are attached and the statements above apply to each (each complaint must have one or more causes of action attached) : (] Breach of Contract X1 Common Counts TWO CAUSES ] Other (specify) :

Prior to commencement of this action AMERICAN AMBULANCE assigned it's respective claim(s) 9. [X] Other allegations: to the plaintiff for collection, plaintiff is now the assignee thereof. Plaintiff is a collection agency and not a "debt buyer", as defined in Civil Code section 1788.50.

10. Plaintiff prays for judgment for costs of suit; for such relief as is fair, just, and equitable; and for a. [X] damages of: $ 2,322.65 : b. [X] interest on the damages (1) [] according to proof (2) [X] attherate of (specify): 10 percent per year from (date) : 8/23/16 c. [X] attorney's fees

() X1 of $ 46453 ASTOALLCAUSES (2) (] according to proof. d. [X] other (specify) : This is an action based on an open book account(s) entered into after 1/1/87 which does not

provide for attorney fees and costs and is, therefore, subject to attorney fees pursuant to civil code section 1717.5 11. L} The paragraphs of this pleading alleged on information and belief are as follows (specify paragraph numbers):

JUN 08

Date: ' 2018

(TYPE OR PRINT NAME) (SIGNATURE OF PLAINTIFF OR ATTORNEY)