This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 08:38:42 (UTC).

Club One Casino, Inc. vs. Louis Sarantos

Case Summary

On 08/26/2015 Club One Casino, Inc filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against Louis Sarantos. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Ikeda, Dale, Snauffer, Mark, Hamilton, Jeffrey Y., Black, Donald, Pebet, Noelle, McGuire, Rosemary and Tharpe, D Tyler. The case status is Other - Transferred.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2704

  • Filing Date:

    08/26/2015

  • Case Status:

    Other - Transferred

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Ikeda, Dale

Snauffer, Mark

Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.

Black, Donald

Pebet, Noelle

McGuire, Rosemary

Tharpe, D Tyler

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Club One Casino, Inc.

Club One Acquisition Corp

Defendants

Sarantos, Louis

Sarantos, George

Clovis 500 Cluub

Capps, Joseph F.

Cardot, John

Perry, Dusten

Sarantos, Shawn

Francesconi, Lodi

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Littlewood, William H.

Defendant Attorneys

Betts, James B.

Cornwell, Stephen R.

Savage, Olga

Wilkins, James H.

Whelan, Walter W.

 

Court Documents

Judgment

Dismissal - Other filed; Judgment Type: Dismissal - Other filed; Comment: (Dismissal of Fourth Cause of Action for Negligent Intereference with Prospective Economic advantage as to defendant Louis Sarantos. With Prejudice.)

Notice Filed

Exhibit A - 2 to Notice; Comment: Exhibit A - 2 to Notice

Declaration Filed

Declaration; Comment: of Sydney A. Smith in Support of Plaintiff Club One Casino, Inc.'s Motion for an Order Granting Leave to Amend Complaint

Stipulation and Order filed

Civil Document; Judicial Officer: Snauffer, Mark; Comment: protective order regarding confidential information

Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review

Request for Dismissal; Comment: Request for Dismissal

Order filed

Order filed; Judicial Officer: Snauffer, Mark; Comment: Stipulaton for Extension of Time to File Response to First Amended Complaint - Granted.

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment; Comment: Attached Tentative Ruling

Demurrer Filed

Civil Document

Judgment

Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name:; Comment: With Prejudice.

Notice Filed

Exhibit A - 5 to Notice; Comment: Exhibit A - 5 to Notice

Opposition to Request for Pre-Trial Discovery filed

Opposition To Request for PreTrial Discovery Conference; Comment: No Action Taken removed to Federal Court Forwarded to dept. 501

Notice Filed

Notice Filed; Comment: Change of Calendar setting

Clerk's Certificate of Mailing

Clerk's Certificate of Mailing; Comment: I certify that I am not a party to this cause and a true copy of the ( Order on Pretrial Discovery Conference ) was placed in a sealed envelope and placed for collection and mailing on the date and at the place shown below following our ordinary business practice. I am readily familiar with this court's practice for collection and processing correspondence for mailing. On the same day that correspondence is placed for collection and mailing, it is deposited in the ordinary course of business with the United States Postal Service with postage fully prepaid. Place of Mailing: Fresno, California on ( ) . Parties served: ( )

Stipulation and Order to Continue Trial filed

Civil Document; Judicial Officer: Snauffer, Mark; Comment: Trial Dates Vacated. TSC set for April 20, 2017 at 3:30 PM in Dept. # 501 Signed by Judge Snauffer

Answer Filed

Answer Filed; Comment: To First Amended Complaint.

Notice Filed

Notice Filed; Comment: Notice and acknowledgment of Receipt/not attached to the proper proof of service

Civil case cover sheet

Civil Document

96 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name:; Comment: With Prejudice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal - Other filed; Judgment Type: Dismissal - Other filed; Comment: (Dismissal of Fourth Cause of Action for Negligent Intereference with Prospective Economic advantage as to defendant Louis Sarantos. With Prejudice.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • Case Management Conference- Judicial Officer: Tharpe, D Tyler; Hearing Time: 3:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • Motion - Disqualify- Judicial Officer: McGuire, Rosemary; Hearing Time: 3:27 PM; Cancel Reason: Off Calendar; Comment: Jim Wilkins

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • Motion - Stay- Judicial Officer: McGuire, Rosemary; Hearing Time: 3:27 PM; Cancel Reason: Off Calendar; Comment: Steven McGee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Order filed- Order filed; Judicial Officer: McGuire, Rosemary; Comment: Clarifying case status as stayed due to jurisdiction of the Federal Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • Chambers Work- Pre- Judicial Officer: McGuire, Rosemary; Hearing Time: 5:30 PM; Result: Uncontested

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • Case Management Conference- Judicial Officer: Tharpe, D Tyler; Hearing Time: 3:30 PM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer Filed- Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - No Fee; Comment: to Second Amended Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
154 More Docket Entries
  • 06/18/2019
  • Financial info for Club One Casino, Inc.: Transaction Assessment $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • Financial info for Club One Casino, Inc.: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2019-31592 Club One Casino, Inc. $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • Financial info for Club One Casino, Inc.: Transaction Assessment $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • Financial info for Club One Casino, Inc.: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2017-20573 Club One Casino, Inc. $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • Financial info for Club One Casino, Inc.: Transaction Assessment $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • Financial info for Club One Casino, Inc.: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2017-16535 Club One Casino, Inc. $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • Financial info for Club One Casino, Inc.: Transaction Assessment $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2015
  • Financial info for Club One Casino, Inc.: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2015-00019398 Littlewood, William H. $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2015
  • Financial info for Club One Casino, Inc.: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2015
  • Financial: Club One Casino, Inc.; Total Financial Assessment $725.00; Total Payments and Credits $725.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.