This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/10/2018 at 02:07:03 (UTC).

Clovis Unified School District vs.P.R. Farms, Incorporated

Case Summary

On 07/23/2015 Clovis Unified School District filed a Property - Eminent Domain lawsuit against P R Farms, Incorporated. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Ikeda, Dale, Snauffer, Mark and Culver Kapetan, Kristi. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2322

  • Filing Date:

    07/23/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Eminent Domain

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Ikeda, Dale

Snauffer, Mark

Culver Kapetan, Kristi

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Clovis Unified School District

Defendants

P.R. Farms, Incorporated

P-R Farms Incorporated

Palomate Packing Company, Inc.

Fresno Irrigation District

Fresno Metropolitan Flood Control District

Central Valley Community Bank

erroneously named herein as P-R Farms Incorporated

Clovis Community Bank

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Behrens, Jerome M.

Defendant Attorneys

Gorman, Patrick J

Wilkinson, Robert D.

Weber, Matthew J.

 

Court Documents

Notice Filed

Notice Filed; Comment: CourtCall Appearance

Case Management Statement Filed

Case Management Statement Filed

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Declaration Filed

Declaration Filed

Notice Filed

Notice Filed; Comment: pendency of action

Civil Complaint filed

Civil Document

Judgment

Request for Dismissal filed; Judgment Type: Request for Dismissal filed; Party Names: Clovis Unified School District; P.R. Farms, Incorporated; Palomate Packing Company, Inc.; Fresno Irrigation District; Fresno Metropolitan Flood Control District; Central Valley Community Bank; Comment: With Prejudice.

Case Management Statement Filed

Case Management Statement Filed

Notice Filed

Notice Filed; Comment: CourtCall Appearance

Answer Filed

Civil Document; Comment: Answer to Complaint in Eminent Domain and Demand for Jury Trial

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Summons issued and filed

Civil Document

Civil case cover sheet

Civil Document

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Request for Dismissal filed; Judgment Type: Request for Dismissal filed; Party Names: Clovis Unified School District; P.R. Farms, Incorporated; Palomate Packing Company, Inc.; Fresno Irrigation District; Fresno Metropolitan Flood Control District; Central Valley Community Bank; Comment: With Prejudice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • Jury Trial- Judicial Officer: Snauffer, Mark; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Settled; Comment: Requested by Defendant only with an estimated time of 3-5 days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • Trial Readiness- Judicial Officer: Snauffer, Mark; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Settled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • Mandatory Settlement Conference- Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Settled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed- Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2016
  • CRC225 Dismiss After Settlement- Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Cancel Reason: Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review- Request for Dismissal; Comment: CUSD Request for Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2016
  • OSC - ADR Stipulation- Judicial Officer: Ikeda, Dale; Hearing Time: 10:07 AM; Cancel Reason: Settled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Settlement filed- Notice of Settlement filed; Comment: no specific date of completion provided, clerk processes the notice as an unconditional settlement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice Filed- Notice Filed; Comment: Demand for Exchange of Expert Witness Lists and Statements of Valuation Data

    Read MoreRead Less
58 More Docket Entries
  • 11/05/2015
  • Financial: Fresno Metropolitan Flood Control District; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2015
  • Financial info for Palomate Packing Company, Inc.: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2015-00019013 Wild Carter $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2015
  • Financial info for Palomate Packing Company, Inc.: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2015
  • Financial: Palomate Packing Company, Inc.; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2015
  • Financial info for P.R. Farms, Incorporated: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2015-00020833 Lozano $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2015
  • Financial info for P.R. Farms, Incorporated: Transaction Assessment $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2015
  • Financial: P.R. Farms, Incorporated; Total Financial Assessment $20.00; Total Payments and Credits $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2015
  • Financial info for Clovis Unified School District: Government Exemption Claimed $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2015
  • Financial info for Clovis Unified School District: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2015
  • Financial: Clovis Unified School District; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.