This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 07:47:51 (UTC).

Clark Bros., Inc. vs. Gierlich-Mitchell, Inc.

Case Summary

On 02/16/2017 Clark Bros , Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Gierlich-Mitchell, Inc. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Snauffer, Mark, Simpson, Alan, McGuire, Rosemary and Black, Donald. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0503

  • Filing Date:

    02/16/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Snauffer, Mark

Simpson, Alan

McGuire, Rosemary

Black, Donald

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Clark Bros., Inc.

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

Ebara International Corporation

Gierlich-Mitchell, Inc.

Aecom

Clark Bros,, Inc.

Aecom Technical Services, Inc.

Defendant and Cross Defendant

Gierlich-Mitchell, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

Thomas, Mark C.

Blaisdell, Benjamin W.

Antoniou, Alexi P

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

Blaisdell, Benjamin W.

Foley, Thomas R

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorney

Foley, Thomas R

 

Court Documents

Case Management Statement Filed

11 28 17 CMC Stmt.pdf

Answer Filed

Ebara's Ans to Complaint of Clark Bros.doc.pdf; Comment: Ebara International Corp.s Answer to Complaint of Clark Bros. Inc.

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Answer Filed

Answer to Cross-Complaint.pdf

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Case Management Statement Filed

17.6.12 CMC Statement.pdf

Summons issued and filed

Summons-Clark Bros Case.pdf; Summons issued and filed; Comment: Summons

Answer Filed

Answer-Clark Bros Case Final.pdf; Comment: Answer to Complaint

Civil Complaint filed

Complaint.pdf

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

ADR Stipulation Mediation filed

ADR Stip filed.pdf; Comment: Parties to engage in mediation. Mediator:Hon. Nickolas Dibiaso

Case Management Statement Filed

10 16 17 CMC Stmt.pdf; Comment: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement Filed

1695205_971CMCSTATEM; Comment: Case Management Statement

Deposit, payment,disbursment

Deposit/Payment to Fresno Superior Court; Comment: Jury fees posted by Defendant Aecom Technical Services

Answer Filed

Answer to Cross Complaint.pdf; Comment: to 1st Cross-Complaint.

Summons issued and filed

Summons-Clark Bros Case.pdf; Summons issued and filed; Comment: Summons

Summons issued and filed

Summons.pdf; Summons issued and filed

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing; Comment: Notice of CMC

35 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Names: Ebara International Corporation; Comment: With Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judicial Officer: Snauffer, Mark; Judgment Type: Dismissal - Other filed; Comment: (As to First Cross Complaint); Party Names: Aecom Technical Services, Inc.; Gierlich-Mitchell, Inc.; Clark Bros,, Inc.; Ebara International Corporation; Comment: With Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Comment: (With Prejudice); Party Names: Clark Bros., Inc.; Gierlich-Mitchell, Inc.; Ebara International Corporation; Comment: As to Original Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • Jury Trial- Judicial Officer: Simpson, Alan; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissed; Comment: Requested by both parties with estimated time of 8-10 days.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • Trial Readiness- Judicial Officer: Black, Donald; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • Mandatory Settlement Conference- Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing- Notice of Hearing; Comment: Due to Civil Presiding Department Change

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice Filed- Notice Filed; Comment: of reassignment of judge for all purposes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed- NOT of Entry of Dismissal.pdf; Comment: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review- Request for Dismissal of Ebara's X-Complaint.pdf

    Read MoreRead Less
57 More Docket Entries
  • 06/13/2017
  • Financial info for Gierlich-Mitchell, Inc.: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2017-30594 Gierlich-Mitchell, Inc. $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2017
  • Financial info for Gierlich-Mitchell, Inc.: Transaction Assessment $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • Financial info for Gierlich-Mitchell, Inc.: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2017-18894 Gierlich-Mitchell, Inc. $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • Financial info for Gierlich-Mitchell, Inc.: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • Financial: Gierlich-Mitchell, Inc.; Total Financial Assessment $585.00; Total Payments and Credits $585.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • Financial info for Clark Bros., Inc.: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2017-27074 Clark Bros., Inc. $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • Financial info for Clark Bros., Inc.: Transaction Assessment $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2017
  • Financial info for Clark Bros., Inc.: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2017-08583 Clark Bros., Inc. $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2017
  • Financial info for Clark Bros., Inc.: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2017
  • Financial: Clark Bros., Inc.; Total Financial Assessment $585.00; Total Payments and Credits $585.00

    Read MoreRead Less