This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 07/12/2022 at 21:54:54 (UTC).

City of Fresno vs Norris Cobb

Case Summary

On 01/03/2014 City of Fresno filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Norris Cobb. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Fresno County BF Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Hamilton, Jeffrey Y, Cullers, Mark, Hamilton, Jeffrey Y., Gamoian, Lisa, Dalesandro, Samuel and Diaz, Monica. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0015

  • Filing Date:

    01/03/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Hamilton, Jeffrey Y

Cullers, Mark

Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.

Gamoian, Lisa

Dalesandro, Samuel

Diaz, Monica

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

City of Fresno

psi, Administered by Risico Claims Management

Defendant

Cobb, Norris Shane, II

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kern, Richard J.

Parker, Kern, Nard & Wenzel 1111 E Herndon Ste 202

Fresno, CA 93720

 

Court Documents

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Declaration Filed

Declaration; Comment: Declaration of Scott Payn

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Request Filed

Request Filed; Comment: for Court Judgment

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Declaration Filed

Declaration Filed; Comment: Declaration of Joyce Samra RE: Judgment

Amended Document Filed

Civil Document; Comment: First amended complaint

Request for Court Judgment

Request for Court Judgment; Comment: Request for Default Judgment

Request to Enter Default Denied

Request to Enter Default Denied; Comment: as to Norris Shane Cobb II - 1.a.(date) incorrect

Substitution of Attorney

10/19/2018: Substitution of Attorney

Abstract

10/19/2018: Abstract

Notice of Entry of Judgment

10/04/2018: Notice of Entry of Judgment

Minute Order Attachment

08/09/2018: Minute Order Attachment

Request to Enter Default Denied

08/08/2018: Request to Enter Default Denied

Judgment

08/08/2018: Judgment

Declaration

08/08/2018: Declaration

Declaration

08/08/2018: Declaration

Declaration

08/08/2018: Declaration

121 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/08/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Pre; Judicial Officer: Diaz, Monica; Hearing Time: 8:32 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment; Comment: judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney Filed; Comment: Substitution of Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment Issued; Comment: Amount: $33,600.87

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment; Comment: Notice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.; Judgment Type: Default Judgment by Court; Party; Names: City of Fresno; Cobb, Norris Shane, II; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To; City of Fresno; Awarded Against; Cobb, Norris Shane, II; Amount; Damages: $31,253.37; Costs: $2,347.50; Total: $33600.87

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • DocketChambers Work- Pre; Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.; Hearing Time: 5:30 PM; Result: Chambers Work - Order Submitted for Consideration; Comment: Judgment forwarded to RA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order Attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Pre; Judicial Officer: Diaz, Monica; Hearing Time: 8:32 AM; Result: Heard; Comment: judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default Denied; Comment: previously entered on 2/28/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment Received; Comment: Judgment signed and issued. Forwarded to clerks office 09/13/2018, for further processing. Forwarded to RA on 8/10/18

    Read MoreRead Less
122 More Docket Entries
  • 05/02/2014
  • DocketClerk Cert of Mailing Printed; Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CDAEVNT on 02-MAY-2014 by RLSMITH.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2014
  • DocketDemand for jury trial filed; Comment: Demand for jury trial filed by Plaintiff . lmw

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2014
  • DocketNotice of change of address; Comment: Notice of change of address of Richard J Kern and Kristi M Costa. dhouston

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2014
  • DocketNotice of Case Mgnt Conf; Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CSAEVNT on 03-JAN-2014 by LESPARZA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2014
  • DocketNotice of Case Mgnt Conf; Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CSAEVNT on 03-JAN-2014 by LESPARZA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2014
  • DocketZ_Conversion; Comment: Government exemption to payment of filing fees claimed. le Event: Government Exemption Claimed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2014
  • DocketSummons filed; Comment: Summons on Complaint filed. le

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2014
  • DocketCivil complaint filed; Comment: Civil complaint filed le

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2014
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet; Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet le

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2014
  • DocketZ_Conversion; Comment: Event: New Civil Case Filed

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

“ ) NS R

ERIC V. GRIJALVA, 264426

PARKER, KERN, NARD & WENZEL 7112 N. Fresno Street, Suite 300

Fresno, California 93720

Telephone: (559) 449-2558 | Facsimile: (559) 449-2564 f

Attorneys for: Plaintiff, CITY OF FRESNO, psi, Administered by RISICO CLAIMS MANAGEMENT, fonnerly AMERICAN

ALL-RISK LOSS ADMINISTRATORS SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA IN AND FOR THE COUNTY OF FRESNO

i . . ) | CITY OF FRESNO, psi, Administered by Case No.: 14CECG00015 JH

AMERICAN ALL-RISK LOSS g ‘ ADMINISTRATORS, ) . ) DECLARATION OF ERIC V. Plaintiff, ) GRIJALVA IN SUPPORT OF

) APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR

Vs. ) PUBLICATION { NORRIS SHANE COBB, II; DOES 1 to 50, ; inclusive, ) | Defendants. ; ;

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where psi, Administered by Risico Claims Management is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kern, Richard J.