This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 08/05/2019 at 13:57:52 (UTC).

CONSOLIDATED WITH 18CECG00718

Case Summary

On 03/21/2018 a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury case was filed by CONSOLIDATED WITH 18CECG00718 in the jurisdiction of Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3134

  • Filing Date:

    03/21/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other - Consolidated

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

City of Fresno

Defendants

1-5, inclusive, Does

Cerda, Jaime Daniel

Cerda, Linda

 

Court Documents

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Summons issued and filed

Summons; Summons issued and filed; Comment: 1st AMENDED Summons

Summons issued and filed

Summons; Summons issued and filed; Comment: 1st AMENDED Summons

Request for Default Received

Request for Entry of Default; Comment: without Judgment

Amendment filed

Notice; Comment: Document: Doe Amendment to complaint name of doe to be Linda Cerda

Amended Document Filed

Amended Document Filed

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: On 6/6/18 the Fist Amended Complaint; Statement of Damages mailed to Jaime D. Cerda

Notice Filed

Notice; Comment: Notice of Commencement of Action

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: Proof of Service

Order Granting Waiver of Court Fees and Cost Signed

Order Granting Waiver of Court Fees and Cost Signed; Comment: By Clerk

Answer Filed

Answer Filed

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: Amended Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: Jaime Daniel Cerda - DEFECTIVE

Civil case cover sheet

Amended Document Filed; Comment: First Amended Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing; Comment: CMC

Summons issued and filed

Summons; Summons issued and filed

Summons issued and filed

Summons

Civil case cover sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/01/2018
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Order Consolidating Actions; Party Names: City of Fresno; Cerda, Jaime Daniel; Cerda, Linda

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • Case Management Conference- Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Consolidated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Order Granting Waiver of Court Fees and Cost Signed- Order Granting Waiver of Court Fees and Cost Signed; Comment: By Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer Filed- Answer Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • Case Management Conference- Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed- Summons; Summons issued and filed; Comment: 1st AMENDED Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request to Enter Default Denied- Request to Enter Default Denied; Comment: Item #1(a) does not match most current action / Pleading. Proof of Service is defective.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Default Received- Request for Entry of Default; Comment: without Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Amendment filed- Notice; Comment: Document: Doe Amendment to complaint name of doe to be Linda Cerda

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 04/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing- Notice of Hearing; Comment: CMC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed- Summons; Summons issued and filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Complaint filed- Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil case cover sheet- Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • Financial info for Cerda, Linda: Fee Waiver $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • Financial info for Cerda, Linda: Transaction Assessment $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • Financial: Cerda, Linda; Total Financial Assessment $225.00; Total Payments and Credits $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Financial info for City of Fresno: Government Exemption Claimed $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Financial info for City of Fresno: Transaction Assessment $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Financial: City of Fresno; Total Financial Assessment $225.00; Total Payments and Credits $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

DOUGLAS T. SLOAN, City Attorney

CITY OF FRESNO E-FILED

By: Kiristi Costa, Deputy City Attorney (#276415) 6/8/2018 12:37 PM

2600 Fresno Street, Room 2031 FRESNO COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT Fresno, California 93721-3602 By: M. Tiso, Deputy

Telephone: (559) 621-7500

Facsimile: (559) 488-1084

Attorneys for Plaintiff, CITY OF FRESNO Exempt From Filing Fees Pursuant

To Government Code Section 6103

IN THE SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA IN AND FOR THE COUNTY OF FRESNO

CITY OF FRESNO, a municipal corporation, ; Case No.: 18CECLO03134 Plaintiff. ) DOE AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT ) VS. ) ) JAIME DANIEL CERDA, and Does 1-5, g inclusive, ) Defendants. ) ) ) Action Filed: 03/21/18 ) Trial Date: None Set

Pursuant to CCP Section 474, Plaintiff City of Fresno (“City or Plaintiff”) has discovered the true names of the Doe Number 1 to be LINDA CERDA. Therefore, the complaint in this matter is hereby amended to reflect that every reference to Doe Number 1 is now a reference to

LINDA CERDA.

DATED: June 6, 2018. Respectfully submitted,

DOUGLAS T. SLOAN City Attorney r——’) By: 7/ i

KRISTI COSTA

Deputy City Attorney

KMC:js[80483js/kmc] Attorneys for Plaintiff, CITY OF FRESNO

City of Fresno v. Jaime Cerda Case No.: 18CECL03134 Doe Amendment to Complaint