This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 16:42:51 (UTC).

City of Fresno, a municipal corporation vs. Jerry Cromartie

Case Summary

On 12/06/2017 City of Fresno, a municipal corporation filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Jerry Cromartie. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Culver Kapetan, Kristi. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4201

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Culver Kapetan, Kristi

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

City of Fresno, a municipal corporation

Defendant

Cromartie, Jerry Bryant

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jorgensen, Kenneth J.

 

Court Documents

Civil case cover sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Complaint filed

Complaint

Summons issued and filed

Summons; Summons issued and filed

Summons issued and filed

Summons; Summons issued and filed

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing; Comment: OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGE FOR ALL PURPOSES

Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review

Request for Dismissal; Comment: Request for Dismissal

Judgment

Request for Dismissal filed; Judgment Type: Request for Dismissal filed; Party Names: City of Fresno, a municipal corporation; Cromartie, Jerry Bryant; Comment: with prejudice - entire action

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Request for Dismissal filed; Judgment Type: Request for Dismissal filed; Party Names: City of Fresno, a municipal corporation; Cromartie, Jerry Bryant; Comment: with prejudice - entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • Case Management Conference- Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review- Request for Dismissal; Comment: Request for Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing- Notice of Hearing; Comment: OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGE FOR ALL PURPOSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed- Summons; Summons issued and filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Complaint filed- Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil case cover sheet- Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer JORGENSEN, KENNETH J.