This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/13/2018 at 03:48:12 (UTC).

City of Clovis vs Greg Borden

Case Summary

On 09/02/2016 City of Clovis filed a Property - Eminent Domain lawsuit against Greg Borden. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are McGuire, Rosemary, Dalesandro, Samuel, Diaz, Monica and Black, Donald. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2857

  • Filing Date:

    09/02/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Eminent Domain

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

McGuire, Rosemary

Dalesandro, Samuel

Diaz, Monica

Black, Donald

 

Party Details

Defendants

Southern California Edison Company

County of Tulare

Lind, Max G

JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.

Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., national association

Petroleum Finance Corporation

Fresno Metropolitan Flood Control District

Fresno County Federal Credit Union, a California corporation

World Savings Bank,

Hixon, Eva

Pacific Bell, a California corporation

Moore, James F, JR

Lum, Susan

Allied Acceptance Corporation

Santellan, Scott

McGee, Robby Dale

O'Leary, Patrick

Verni, Leonard

Pensco Trust Company Custodian FBO Peter Van Vleet IRA

Pavich, Betsy

119 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Layne, Lauren D.

Tristao, Craig A.

Other Attorneys

Wolfe, David J

Cross, Scott G.

Roberson, Kyle R

Chappel, Gregory M.

Alegria, Jr., Cesar V

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: The Van Vleet & Van Vleet Profit Sharing Plan

Declaration Filed

Declaration; Comment: of Patrick O' Leary in support of defendant's joinder to Thomas Minor's opposition to motion for pre-judgment order for possession

Opposition filed

Joinder to Defendant Minor's Evidentiary Objections in Oppos; Comment: Joinder to Defendant Minor's Evidentiary Objections in Opposition to Motion for Pre-Judgment Order for Possession

Opposition filed

Joinder to Defendant Minor's Opposition to Motion for Pre-Ju; Comment: Joinder to Defendant Minor's Opposition to Motion for Pre-Judgment Order for Possession

Disclaimer of Interest

Notice

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: County of Placer

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: Ann J. Stewart

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: as to Ann J. Stewart

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: POS - Fresno County Tax Collector

Disclaimer of Interest

Notice

Notice Filed

Notice; Comment: Notice of Continuance of Hearing on Plaintiffs Motion for Order for Prejudgment Possession

Memorandum of Points and Authorities

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Oppositio; Comment: Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Oppositioin to Motion for Order for Prejudgment Possession

Answer Filed

City of Clovis v Borden PGEs Answer.pdf

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: Fresno County Federal Credit Union

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: POS - State of California

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: POS - Betsy Pavich

Notice Filed

Notice; Comment: of Pending Action (Lis Pendens)

115 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Names: Khudari, Fawzi; Biglione, Claude; Biglione, Azalea; Russo, Joseph W; Russo, Mamie A; County of Placer; California Franchise Tax Board; AXA Network, LLC; Leonard, J. Scott; Guarantee Real Estate; Comment: Entire Action of Parties listed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Names: McGee, Robby Dale; McGee, Patricia Ann; Bureau of Reclamation; McGee, Gay P; World Savings Bank,; Stewart, John H; Stewart, Ann J; Pruitt, Duana F; Moore, James F, JR; Campagna, Tom F; Pacific Telephone & Telegraph Company; Fresno County Federal Credit Union, a California corporation; Comment: with prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: Union Bank of California, N.A.; Comment: with prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Names: Loo, Harry; Loo, Irene; Lee, Bailey; Lum, Susan; Lum, Steven C.Y.; Lum, Catherine J; Siu, Chung Yet; Siu, Ho Cheong; LFH, LLC; Southern California Edison Company; Muhareb, Shafiq; Muhareb, Taghrid; Davide, Sal; Davide, Theresa; Goshgarian, George G; Gregory, Kathleen A; Creditors Trade Association, inc; Turner, June; Peterson, Robert J; Hixon, Eva; Peterson, Robert J; Dhaliwal, Navdeep Singh; Comment: with prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • Order to Show Cause - Pre- Judicial Officer: Diaz, Monica; Hearing Time: 8:32 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • General Motion- Judicial Officer: Black, Donald; Hearing Time: 3:28 PM; Comment: Prejudgment possession Scott Cross

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review- Request for Dismissal; Comment: Request for Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration Filed- Declaration; Comment: Disclaimer of John Warkentin, Trustee of John & Marjolein Warkentin Family Trust

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • Order to Show Cause - Pre- Judicial Officer: Diaz, Monica; Hearing Time: 9:32 AM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
197 More Docket Entries
  • 11/22/2017
  • Financial: County of Fresno; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • Financial info for City of Clovis: Government Exemption Claimed $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • Financial info for City of Clovis: Transaction Assessment $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • Financial info for City of Clovis: Government Exemption Claimed $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • Financial info for City of Clovis: Transaction Assessment $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • Financial info for City of Clovis: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2017-64073 City of Clovis $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • Financial info for City of Clovis: Transaction Assessment $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2016
  • Financial info for City of Clovis: Government Exemption Claimed $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2016
  • Financial info for City of Clovis: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2016
  • Financial: City of Clovis; Total Financial Assessment $495.00; Total Payments and Credits $495.00

    Read MoreRead Less