This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 04/07/2018 at 15:25:57 (UTC).

Citibank (South Dakota) vs Michael J Spolini/CC

Case Summary

On 06/29/2009 Citibank South Dakota filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Michael J Spolini/CC. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Clovis Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Fain, Gregory. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0542

  • Filing Date:

    06/29/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Clovis Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Fain, Gregory

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Citibank (South Dakota) N.A.

Defendant

Spolini, Michael J

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Henriques, Janalie

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2010
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Conversion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2010
  • Collection Case Review- Original Type: Collection Case Review; Judicial Officer: Fain, Gregory; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Result: Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2010
  • Off calendar- Comment: Off calendar for OSC3 scheduled for 2-24-10 PSN .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2010
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Request for Dismissal filed. Action dismissed WITHOUT prejudice. PSN Event: Dismissal filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2010
  • Notice of Cal Setting Printed- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CSAEVNT on 14-JAN-2010 by PNUNO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2010
  • Collection Case Rev Minutes- Comment: Order to Show Cause hearing set for 2-24-10 at 11:00 a.m. in Clovis Department #1 for failure to serve all defendants/file proofs of service/request service by publication. psn

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2010
  • Collection Case Review- Judicial Officer: Fain, Gregory; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2009
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$200.00 was made on receipt CLCL26108.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2009
  • Notice Col Case Review Prtd- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CMAINIT on 14-JUL-2009 by VSALAZAR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2009
  • JBSIS: New Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2009
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Complaint filed - summons issued . Event: Civil complaint filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2009
  • Civil Case Cove Sheet 3.740- Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. Case designated as a CRC Rule 3.740 Collections Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2009
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Event: New Civil Case Filed

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.