This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 07:43:46 (UTC).

Cindy Puddy vs. Beazer Homes Holdings Corp/COMPLEX

Case Summary

On 08/04/2016 Cindy Puddy filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against Beazer Homes Holdings Corp/COMPLEX. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Simpson, Alan, Gaab, Kimberly, Snauffer, Mark and Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2509

  • Filing Date:

    08/04/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Simpson, Alan

Gaab, Kimberly

Snauffer, Mark

Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HERNANDEZ, VERONICA

VERONICA LOPEZ LIVING TRUST

PUDDY, CINDY

MENDEZ-TAPIA, RICARDO

MIRANDA, ENRIQUE

VEGA DE OCAMPO, ELENA

D'SOUZA, CHERIDA-ANN

GAITAN, ANA AGUILAR

BANKS, RYAN

LEE, YEE

YANG, LIA

KAUR, DARSHAN

HER, BLIA YANG

TRAVIS, APRIL

HER, CHENG

LEAL, ANA BERTHA RIVERA

LOPEZ, VERONICA

STORMO, LAVERNE EDWARD

HERNANDEZ, J. CONCEPCION RAMIREZ

SOMSANUK, SOURIPHONG

136 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Chodzko, Megan M

Other Attorneys

Crespo, Daniel A

Cote, Scott D.

Vairetta, Wendi N.

Evans-Bonaell, Lynn E.

Souza, James P

Boze, John L.

Moak, Stacy

McNeill, Timothy C.

Harmata, Donald D.

Murphy, Jason M.

Hammons, Wallace W

Titus, Robert B

McCarthy, Michael

Bournazian, J David

 

Court Documents

Order Received for Signature

Stipulation and Order; Comment: forwarded to clerk's office for futher processing 9/5/17 Forwarded to: Dept. 503 Order for: Appoint Speical Master

Answer Filed

Answer to Cross-Complaint 3-1-2017.pdf; Comment: SACRAMENTO INSULATION CONTRACTORS d/b/a SACRAMENTO BUILDING PRODUCTS??? ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT OF BEAZER HOMES HOLDINGS CORP.

Judgment

Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: Sonoran Roofing, Inc.; Comment: Without Prejudice.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities

P&A Mtn for Lv re Compl in Intrvntn.pdf; Comment: in support of motion to intervene

Order Received for Signature

Proposed Order; Comment: Pre-Trial Order No. 1 Forwarded to 4th floor clerk's office for further processing

Summons issued and filed

Summons; Summons issued and filed; Comment: SUMMONS ON CROSS-COMPLAINT

Answer Filed

Answer to Cross-Complaint - SRVC.pdf; Comment: To 1st CROSS-COMPLAINT

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: Proof of Service

Answer Filed

20170410104422.pdf; Comment: Grant Construction, Inc.'s Answer to Beazer Homes Holdings Corp.'s Cross-Complaint

Letter Received

Letter Received; Comment: Letter to Judge re PTO-2

Summons issued and filed

Summons; Summons issued and filed; Comment: SUMMONS ON CROSS-COMPLAINT

Cross Complaint Filed

Cross-Complaint - SRVC.pdf; Comment: 2nd Cross Complaint

Judgment

Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Names: Baku Corporation; Elite Landscaping; Comment: with prejudice

Case Management Statement Filed

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement Filed

20170413120824.pdf; Comment: Case Management Statement

Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review

Request for Dismissal; Comment: Request for Dismissal

Notice Filed

Notice; Comment: Notice of Errata re: Homeowners' Address

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: Proof of Service

287 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: MCB Framers, Inc.; Comment: With Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: CVC Contruction Corporation; Comment: with prejudice from Cross-complaint filed by Beazer Homes Holdings Corp. 9/28/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: DB Company; Comment: with prejudice from Cross-complaint filed by Beazer Homes Holdings Corp. 9/28/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: Metropolitan Interior Designs, Inc.; Comment: with prejudice from Cross-complaint filed by Beazer Homes Holdings Corp. 9/28/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: Grant Construction, Inc.; Comment: With Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: J.R. Pierce Plumbing Co., Inc. of Sacramento; Comment: With prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal - Other filed; Judgment Type: Dismissal - Other filed; Party Names: Puddy, Cindy; Beazer Homes Holdings Corp; Angelo, Mario; (Khalfan) Angelo, Sarah; Anyanwu, Prince; Chijioke, Ebele; Banks, Ryan; Banks, Amanda; Brown, Jeff; Cisneros, Catherine; Beltran, Ricardo; Crader, Leland R.; Crader, Teresa D.; D'Souza, Vicelin J. G. D.; D'Souza, Cherida-Ann; Franco, Humberto; Franco, Bertha; Garbiack, Shauna; Gonzalez, Carlos David Grajeda; Gaitan, Ana Aguilar; Gutierrez, James; Her, Ya Neng; Her, Cheng; Her, Blia Yang; Moua, Zong; Hernandez, J. Concepcion Ramirez; Hernandez, Veronica; Iglesias, Moises; Kleffman, Stephen; Kleffman, Betty J.; Rivera Leal, Ana Bertha; Lee, Yee; Her, Thor; Lopez, Veronica; Veronica Lopez Living Trust; Marby, Jonathan E.; Mason, Barry; Mason, Kari; Mendez-Tapia, Ricardo; Aguilar, Maria; Miranda, Enrique; Rey, Victor; Rey, Teresa; Romero, Antonio; Singh, Kulwant; Kaur, Darshan; Singh, Jaswinder; Kaur, Kuldip; Smith, Lashun; Somsanuk, Vong; Somsanuk, Nee; Somsanuk, Souriphong; Sran, Nachhattar; Sran, Paramjeet; Stormo, Edward Laverne; Stormo, Georgette; Ed & Georgette Stormo Family Trust; Tchaparian, Greg; Tchaparian, Christy; Travis, April; Troya, Marcelo; Barrera, Monica; Vega, Juan; Vega De Ocampo, Elena; Yang, Lia; Heffley, Timothy Keith; Thompson, Louis; Comment: With Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal - Other filed; Judgment Type: Dismissal - Other filed; Party Name:; Comment: (Complaint in Intervention filed 4-12-18 with prejudice)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judicial Officer: Gaab, Kimberly; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: Kertel Communications, Inc.; Comment: with prejudice.; Comment: (as to Defendant in 1st cross complaint)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: CLF Enterprises, Inc.; Comment: with prejudice.; Comment: (as to Defendant in 1st cross complaint)

    Read MoreRead Less
411 More Docket Entries
  • 11/29/2016
  • Financial: Villara Corporation; Total Financial Assessment $1,435.00; Total Payments and Credits $1,435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • Financial info for Access Pro Garage Door, Inc: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2017-18907 Access Pro Garage Door, Inc $1435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • Financial info for Access Pro Garage Door, Inc: Transaction Assessment $1435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • Financial: Access Pro Garage Door, Inc; Total Financial Assessment $1,435.00; Total Payments and Credits $1,435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2016
  • Financial info for Beazer Homes Holdings Corp: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2016-43656 Beazer Homes Holdings Corp $585.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2016
  • Financial info for Beazer Homes Holdings Corp: Transaction Assessment $585.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2016
  • Financial: Beazer Homes Holdings Corp; Total Financial Assessment $585.00; Total Payments and Credits $585.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2016
  • Financial info for Puddy, Cindy: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2016-33706 PUDDY, CINDY $1435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2016
  • Financial info for Puddy, Cindy: Transaction Assessment $1435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2016
  • Financial: Puddy, Cindy; Total Financial Assessment $1,435.00; Total Payments and Credits $1,435.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.