This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 06/06/2022 at 22:16:56 (UTC).

XXXXX

Case Summary

On 08/17/2015 XXXXX was filed as a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Fresno County BF Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Culver Kapetan, Kristi, Gaab, Kimberly, McGuire, Rosemary, Simpson, Alan, Black, Donald, Tharpe, D Tyler and Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2621

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Culver Kapetan, Kristi

Gaab, Kimberly

McGuire, Rosemary

Simpson, Alan

Black, Donald

Tharpe, D Tyler

Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Lima, Christian

Arevalo, Lorenzo E.

Campos, Emiliano

Chapa, Arturo

Chapa, Delia

Delgado, Jose

Diaz, Raymundo

Escobar, Juan F.

Ochoa, Andres

Peralta, Jorge

Flores, Martha

Peralta, Jose S.

Plasencia, Angel

Ruiz, Alfredo

Velasquez de Ruiz, Maria G.

Ruiz, Monica

Solorio, Humberto

Solorio, Rita

Torres, Ruben

Reyes, Maria

95 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kananen, Kurt E.

Other Attorneys

Cano, Gino

Satran, Jerome R.

Coombe, Mary E.

Hammons, Wallace W

Savage, Sara J.

Mittelman, Mark R

Tinkoff, Shelley K.

Hazelton, M. Troy

Sandler, Erika L.

Klawunder, Nina D.

Thorson, Eric W.

11 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Conditional Settlement Reached

Notice; Comment: Projected Completion Date: 11/8/19

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: Amended Proof of Service

Notice Filed

20190726114156312.pdf; Comment: Notice of Disassociation of Counsel

Notice Filed

20190726114148817.pdf; Comment: Notice of Disassociation of Counsel

Notice of Change of Address Filed

CASR 05456 NTC OF CHG ADDRESS 072319.pdf

Clerk's Certificate of Mailing

Clerk's Certificate of Mailing; Comment: I certify that I am not a party to this cause and a true copy of the ( Notice of Assignment of Judge for all Purposes) was placed in a sealed envelope and placed for collection and mailing on the date and at the place shown below following our ordinary business practice. I am readily familiar with this court's practice for collection and processing correspondence for mailing. On the same day that correspondence is placed for collection and mailing, it is deposited in the ordinary course of business with the United States Postal Service with postage fully prepaid. Place of Mailing: Fresno, California on ( ) . Parties served: ( )

Statement filed

Statement; Comment: St. Paul's Statement of Position Re: GS filed by Sacramento Insulation

Notice Filed

Notice Filed; Comment: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: re: Notice of Settlement; Application for Determination of Good Faith Settlement and Order

Minute Order Attachment

01/31/2020: Minute Order Attachment

CASR 05639 Dismissal 013020.pdf

01/30/2020: CASR 05639 Dismissal 013020.pdf

Dismissal Cross-Complaint - SRVC.pdf

01/27/2020: Dismissal Cross-Complaint - SRVC.pdf

Dismissal Cross-Complaint - SRVC.pdf

01/27/2020: Dismissal Cross-Complaint - SRVC.pdf

Request for Dismissal

12/18/2019: Request for Dismissal

RFD+POS - CORRECTED.pdf

12/11/2019: RFD+POS - CORRECTED.pdf

Notice of Hearing

12/06/2019: Notice of Hearing

Dismissal Not Entered

12/05/2019: Dismissal Not Entered

RFD+POS.pdf

12/05/2019: RFD+POS.pdf

628 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2020
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer: Tharpe, D Tyler; Judgment Type: Dismissal Order - Entire Action; Party; Names: Lima, Christian; Arevalo, Lorenzo E.; Campos, Emiliano; Chapa, Arturo; Chapa, Delia; Delgado, Jose; Diaz, Raymundo; Escobar, Juan F.; Ochoa, Andres; Peralta, Jorge; Flores, Martha; Peralta, Jose S.; Plasencia, Angel; Ruiz, Alfredo; Velasquez de Ruiz, Maria G.; Ruiz, Monica; Solorio, Humberto; Solorio, Rita; Torres, Ruben; Reyes, Maria; Torrez, Jack; Torrez, Esther; Villa Sonada Inc.; 105 Howard St., Inc.; 85 Almond Street, Inc.; Valley Vanguard Properties, Inc.; Valley Vanguard Properties, Inc.; Advanced Insulation, Inc.; Apache Erectors, Inc.; Atmos Corporation; B-F Glass, Inc.; Baker Custom Cabinets, Inc.; Erik Mott Painting, Inc.; Ewing Insulation, Inc.; Glass Tech, Inc.; Holt Lumber Inc.; Rocha, Jim; Solis, Julio Rios; La Tierra Verde Landscaping, Inc.; Lighthouse Windows, Inc.; Madera Masonry; Madera Roofing Inc.; Masaaki Kimura; Lang, Matt; McClure Door, Inc.; Pacific Coast Supply LLC; Pacific Door & Cabinet Company; Purl's Sheet Metal & Air Conditioning; Gonzales, Raymundo M.; Staggs, Richard; Robert's Drywall, Inc.; Sacramento Insulation Contractors, Inc.; Solis Construction; Sparky Electric Inc.; Spence Fence Company; Terran Ashjian Enterprises, Inc.; The Peninsula Group, Inc.; Tri-Valley Plastering, Inc.; Western States Plumbing, Inc.; Diebert, William; Ruiz, Jesus; Ruiz, Fabiola; Rodriguez, Miguel; Flores, Araceli; Aguilar, Gustavo Munguia; Baker Custom Cabinets; Moes 1-50; Lighthouse Windows, Inc.; Vezina Industries; Madera Custom Tile & Granite, Inc.; Madera Custom Tile & Granite, Inc.; Apache Erectors, Inc.; Moes 1 through 25; Kimura, Masaaki; Moes 1 through 50; Baker Custom Cabinets, Inc.; Glass Tech , Inc.; Holt Lumber, Inc.; La Tierra Verde Landscaping, Inc.; Lighthouse Windows, Inc.; Madera Custom Tile, Inc.; Madera Roofing, Inc.; Lang, Matt; McClure Door, Inc.; Pacific Door & Cabinet Company; Purl's Sheet Metal & Air Conditioning; Robert's Drywall, Inc.; Sacramento Insulation Contractors, Inc.; Sparky Electric, Inc.; Terran Ashjian Enterprises, Inc.; Tri-Valley Plastering, Inc.; Holt Lumber, Inc.; Holt Lumber, Inc.; Comment: without prejudice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order Attachment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketCRC 3.1385 After Settlement; Judicial Officer: Tharpe, D Tyler; Hearing Time: 8:31 AM; Result: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judgment Type: Dismissal - Other filed; Party; Name: Comment:; Comment; Comment: (As to Complaint in Intervention)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal Received - Pending Review; Comment: Request for Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judgment Type: Dismissal - Other filed; Party; Names: Kimura, Masaaki; Moes 1 through 50; Comment: with prejudice.; Comment; Comment: (as to 5th Cross-Complaint)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judgment Type: Dismissal - Other filed; Party; Names: Baker Custom Cabinets; Moes 1-50; Comment: with prejudice.; Comment; Comment: (as to 2nd Cross-Complain)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal Received - Pending Review; Comment: Request for Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal Received - Pending Review; Comment: Request for Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judgment Type: Dismissal - Other filed; Party; Names: Valley Vanguard Properties, Inc.; Advanced Insulation, Inc.; Apache Erectors, Inc.; Atmos Corporation; B-F Glass, Inc.; Baker Custom Cabinets, Inc.; Erik Mott Painting, Inc.; Ewing Insulation, Inc.; Glass Tech, Inc.; Holt Lumber Inc.; Rocha, Jim; Solis, Julio Rios; La Tierra Verde Landscaping, Inc.; Lighthouse Windows, Inc.; Madera Masonry; Masaaki Kimura; Lang, Matt; McClure Door, Inc.; Pacific Coast Supply LLC; Pacific Door & Cabinet Company; Purl's Sheet Metal & Air Conditioning; Gonzales, Raymundo M.; Staggs, Richard; Robert's Drywall, Inc.; Sacramento Insulation Contractors, Inc.; Solis Construction; Sparky Electric Inc.; Spence Fence Company; Terran Ashjian Enterprises, Inc.; The Peninsula Group, Inc.; Tri-Valley Plastering, Inc.; Western States Plumbing, Inc.; Diebert, William; Madera Custom Tile & Granite, Inc.; Madera Roofing, Inc.; Comment: with prejudice.; Comment; Comment: (as to 1st cross complaint)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
521 More Docket Entries
  • 08/19/2015
  • FinancialFinancial info for Lima, Christian: Transaction Assessment $150.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2015
  • FinancialFinancial info for Lima, Christian: Mail Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2015-00018337 Kananen, Kurt E. $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2015
  • FinancialFinancial info for Lima, Christian: Mail Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2015-00018336 Kananen, Kurt E. $1000.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2015
  • FinancialFinancial info for Lima, Christian: Transaction Assessment $1435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2015
  • FinancialFinancial: Lima, Christian; Total Financial Assessment $1,735.00; Total Payments and Credits $1,735.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Comment: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGE FOR ALL PURPOSES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Filed; Comment: Plaintiff's Notice of Posting Jury Fees

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sandra J. Savage

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Coombe, Mary E.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ERIC W.THORSON

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SATRAN, JEROME R