This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/10/2018 at 02:03:26 (UTC).

Chris Funch vs. Martin Rocha

Case Summary

On 07/23/2015 Chris Funch filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Martin Rocha. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Snauffer, Mark. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2313

  • Filing Date:

    07/23/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Snauffer, Mark

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Funch, Chris

Defendants

Rocha, Martin

Rocha, Alice

Johnson, Lance

Gonzales, Francisco

State of California - Departnent of Motor Vehicles

Lithia FMF, Inc., a California Corporation doing business as Lithia Ford of Fresno

"DMV"

Shimoto, Jean

Rocha, Alice Carrasco

Isaguirre, Joe

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Rowe, Jeffrey D.

Defendant Attorneys

Chapman, Joseph

Gilman, Emmett

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review

Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review

Request for Dismissal

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Declaration Filed

Declaration Filed; Comment: of Lance Johnson in Support of Application for Writ of Possession and Preliminary Injunction

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Memorandum of Points and Authorities

Memorandum of Points and Authorities

Application Filed

Civil Document; Comment: for writ of possession

Declaration Filed

Declaration Filed; Comment: of Lance Johnson

Memorandum of Points and Authorities

Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Comment: in Support of Application for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Notice of Motion

Notice of Motion; Comment: and Motion to: dissolve temporary restraining order

Declaration Filed

Declaration Filed; Comment: of Keith Urein in support of defendant Lithia FMF, Inc. dba Lithia Ford of Fresno's opposition to plaintiff Chris Funch's application for writ of possession and preliminary injunction

Application Filed

Civil Document; Comment: for Writ of Possession After Hearing

Letter of Documents Returned Without Filing

Letter of Documents Returned Without Filing

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Ex parte Filed

Ex parte Filed; Comment: Application for temporary restraining order

Declaration Filed

Declaration Filed; Comment: of Lance Johnson in Support of Application for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause

Notice Filed

Notice Filed; Comment: for Case Management

115 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Request for Dismissal filed; Judgment Type: Request for Dismissal filed; Comment: (Without Prejudice)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Request for Dismissal filed; Judgment Type: Request for Dismissal filed; Party Names: Rocha, Martin; Rocha, Alice Carrasco; Johnson, Lance; Gonzales, Francisco; Isaguirre, Joe; Comment: Without Prejudice.; Comment: (Las Active parties (Entire action is now dismissed))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: Shimoto, Jean; Comment: With Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: State of California - Departnent of Motor Vehicles; Comment: With Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: Lithia FMF, Inc., a California Corporation doing business as Lithia Ford of Fresno; Comment: With Prejudice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2016
  • Case Management Conference- Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review- Request for Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2016
  • Dismissal Not Entered- Comment: Request for dismissal filed. Dismissal not entered as requested for the following reason: # 2 needs to reflect did and page 2 of the request needs to be filled out.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review- Request for Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice Filed- Notice of Entry of Order; Comment: of entry of order

    Read MoreRead Less
177 More Docket Entries
  • 10/19/2015
  • Financial info for Funch, Chris: Transaction Assessment $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2015
  • Financial info for Funch, Chris: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2015-00025320 Funch, Chris $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2015
  • Financial info for Funch, Chris: Transaction Assessment $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2015
  • Financial info for Funch, Chris: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2015-00017900 Rowe, Jeffrey D. $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2015
  • Financial info for Funch, Chris: Transaction Assessment $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2015
  • Financial info for Funch, Chris: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2015-00017895 Rowe, Jeffrey D. $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2015
  • Financial info for Funch, Chris: Transaction Assessment $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2015
  • Financial info for Funch, Chris: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2015-00014493 Rowe, Jeffrey D. $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2015
  • Financial info for Funch, Chris: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2015
  • Financial: Funch, Chris; Total Financial Assessment $795.00; Total Payments and Credits $795.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.