This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 06/26/2022 at 13:46:34 (UTC).

Chase Bank USA vs. Sura Chai

Case Summary

On 01/21/2011 Chase Bank USA filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Sura Chai. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Clovis Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0046

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Chase Bank USA

Defendant

Chai, Sura

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Hunt, Michael S

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/12/2015
  • DocketReturn filed; Comment: Final Return to Court Writ of Execution filed fully unsatisfied af 03/04/15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2011
  • DocketPayment; Comment: A Payment of -$25.00 was made on receipt CLCL35739.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2011
  • DocketWrit of execution issued; Comment: Writ of execution issued to the county of Fresno in the amount of $ 15610.75 . sal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2011
  • DocketPayment; Comment: A Payment of -$25.00 was made on receipt CLCL35020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2011
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment issued; Comment: Abstract of Judgment issued. vs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2011
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judgment Type: Clerk's Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2011
  • DocketClerk's default judgment; Comment: Documents in support of judgment filed. Judgment entered on 05/10/11 for plaintiff Chase Bank USA, N.A. against defendant Sura Chai in the sum of: Principal: $15,156.75 Interest: $0.00 Atty Fees: $0.00 Costs: $429.00 Total: $15,585.75 vs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2011
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default filed; Comment: Request to enter default filed. Default entered as to Sura Chai. vs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2011
  • DocketDeclaration filed; Comment: Declaration of counsel re: 1)interest; 2)costs (CCP 1033); 3)attorney fees filed. vs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2011
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default Filed; Comment: Request for default filed, Clerk's Judgment ER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2011
  • DocketDeclaration filed; Comment: Declaration of mailing filed. vs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2011
  • DocketDeclaration filed; Comment: Declaration of reasonable diligence filed. vs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2011
  • DocketPOS of summons & comp - subst.; Comment: Proof of service of summons and complaint filed showing substituted service on Ka Pang, mailed on 02/04/11. vs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2011
  • DocketPayment; Comment: A Payment of -$370.00 was made on receipt CLCL33355.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2011
  • DocketZ_Conversion; Comment: Complaint filed - summons issued . Event: Civil complaint filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2011
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet; Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Chase Bank USA NA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HUNT MICHAEL S