This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 02/23/2018 at 21:55:41 (UTC).

Chase Bank USA vs Roel M Sanarez/CC

Case Summary

On 11/17/2010 Chase Bank USA filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Roel M Sanarez/CC. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Clovis Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1647

  • Filing Date:

    11/17/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Clovis Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Chase Bank USA, N.A.

Defendant

Sanarez, Roel M

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Singh, Anita H

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/18/2011
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Clerk's Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2011
  • Satisfaction of judgment-full- Comment: Acknowledgement of full satisfaction of judgment filed ER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2011
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$25.00 was made on receipt CLCL34440.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2011
  • Abstract of Judgment issued- Comment: Abstract of Judgment issued. kjr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2011
  • Clerk's default judgment- Comment: Documents in support of judgment filed. Judgment entered on 03/18/11 for plaintiff Chase Bank USA, N.A. against defendant Roel M Sanarez in the sum of: Principal: $4,587.32 Interest: $0.00 Atty Fees: $0.00 Costs: $284.00 Total: $4,871.32 vs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2011
  • Declaration filed- Comment: Declaration of counsel re: 1)interest; 2)costs (CCP 1033); 3)attorney fees filed. vs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2011
  • Dismissal - Other- Comment: Request for dismissal of The unjust enrichment claim as to all defendants filed and dismissal entered WITHOUT prejudice. vs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2011
  • Request to Enter Default Filed- Comment: Request for default filed, Clerk's Judgment ER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2011
  • Request to Enter Default filed- Comment: Request to enter default filed. Default entered as to Roel M Sanarez. vs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2010
  • Summons & comp - personal- Comment: Summons returned and filed with proof of service of summons and complaint on Roel M Sanarez by personal service on 12/23/10 . cm

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2010
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$20.00 was made on receipt CLCL32528.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2010
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$205.00 was made on receipt CLCL32527.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2010
  • JBSIS: New Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2010
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Complaint filed - summons issued . Event: Civil complaint filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2010
  • Civil Case Cove Sheet 3.740- Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. Case designated as a CRC Rule 3.740 Collections Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2010
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Event: New Civil Case Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2011
  • Financial info for Chase Bank USA, N.A.: Counter Payment Receipt # 34440 Chase Bank USA, N.A. $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2011
  • Financial info for Chase Bank USA, N.A.: Transaction Assessment $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2011
  • Financial: Chase Bank USA, N.A.; Total Financial Assessment $25.00; Total Payments and Credits $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.