This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 02/28/2018 at 02:30:14 (UTC).

Charlene Crabtree vs Carlos Crabtree

Case Summary

On 12/16/2013 Charlene Crabtree filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Carlos Crabtree. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Meehan, Kathleen A and Tharpe, D Tyler. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6668

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Meehan, Kathleen A

Tharpe, D Tyler

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Crabtree, Charlene

Respondent

Crabtree, Carlos

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Hemb, Susan A

Hemb Law Group 1530 E Shaw Ave, Suite 104

Fresno, CA 93710

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/12/2015
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judicial Officer: CONVERSION, JUDGE; Judgment Type: Final Judgment Dissolution/MSA; Party Names: Crabtree, Charlene; Crabtree, Carlos; Comment: Marital Status Ends 06/12/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2015
  • 1 Family - Centered Status Conference- Judicial Officer: Tharpe, D Tyler; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2015
  • Proof of Service by Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2015
  • Withdraw of Attorney- Comment: Attorney Withdrawing: Susan A. Hemb

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2015
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2015
  • Qualified Domestic Relations Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2015
  • Declaration for Default or Uncontested Disso or Legal Sep

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2015
  • Stipulation and Waiver Final Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2015
  • Declaration Filed- Comment: Unrepresented party (Charlene Crabtree)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2015
  • Documents sent to- Comment: Sent Judgment Docs to FLEX for review (File attached)

    Read MoreRead Less
61 More Docket Entries
  • 09/24/2014
  • Financial info for Crabtree, Charlene: Counter Payment Receipt # 231132 Crabtree, Charlene $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2014
  • Financial info for Crabtree, Charlene: Transaction Assessment $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2014
  • Financial info for Crabtree, Charlene: Counter Payment Receipt # 229433 Crabtree, Charlene $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2014
  • Financial info for Crabtree, Charlene: Transaction Assessment $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2014
  • Financial info for Crabtree, Charlene: Counter Payment Receipt # 226496 Crabtree, Charlene $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2014
  • Financial info for Crabtree, Charlene: Transaction Assessment $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2013
  • Financial info for Crabtree, Charlene: Counter Payment Receipt # 216009 Crabtree, Charlene $390.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2013
  • Financial info for Crabtree, Charlene: Counter Payment Receipt # 215937 Crabtree, Charlene $45.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2013
  • Financial info for Crabtree, Charlene: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2013
  • Financial: Crabtree, Charlene; Total Financial Assessment $1,010.00; Total Payments and Credits $575.00

    Read MoreRead Less