This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 08/09/2020 at 17:09:12 (UTC).

Celia Maduena-Young vs. Escallate LLC c/o National Registered Agents Inc

Case Summary

On 06/17/2015 Celia Maduena-Young filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Escallate LLC c/o National Registered Agents Inc. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1172

  • Filing Date:

    06/17/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Maduena-Young, Celia

Defendants

Escallate LLC c/o Michael Frank

Escallate LLC c/o National Registered Agents Inc

Escallate LLC

 

Court Documents

Judgment

Civil Document; Judicial Officer: Judge, Pro Tempore; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Uncontested; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To:; Maduena-Young, Celia; Awarded Against:; Escallate LLC; Amount; Damages: $500.00; Costs: $60.00; Total: $560.00

Return filed

Return filed; Comment: Return of (Request to Pay Judgment to Court and check #1115 in the amount of $589.21, check less than amount due to cover 10% interest) Filed

Letter of Documents Returned Without Filing

Letter of Documents Returned Without Filing; Comment: check #011096 dated 11-2-15 amount $580.00

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Amended Claim filed

Amended Claim filed; Comment: Changing defendant's address and agent of service

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Plaintiff's Claim filed

Plaintiff's Claim filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn filed- Return filed; Comment: Return of (Request to Pay Judgment to Court and check #1115 in the amount of $589.21, check less than amount due to cover 10% interest) Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetter of Documents Returned Without Filing- Letter of Documents Returned Without Filing; Comment: check #011096 dated 11-2-15 amount $580.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2015
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment Mailed to All Parties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment- Civil Document; Judicial Officer: Judge, Pro Tempore; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Uncontested; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To:; Maduena-Young, Celia; Awarded Against:; Escallate LLC; Amount; Damages: $500.00; Costs: $60.00; Total: $560.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2015
  • DocketCourt Trial- Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard; Parties Present- Plaintiff: Maduena-Young, Celia

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2015
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order SC- Comment: Fee $15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service- Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2015
  • FinancialFinancial info for Maduena-Young, Celia: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2015-00013685 Maduena-Young, Celia $15.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2015
  • FinancialFinancial info for Maduena-Young, Celia: Transaction Assessment $15.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2015
  • DocketPlaintiff's claim mailed certified mail- Comment: Tracking number:7013 1090 0001 1471 4117

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmended Claim filed- Amended Claim filed; Comment: Changing defendant's address and agent of service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2015
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order SC- Comment: Fee $15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service- Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2015
  • FinancialFinancial info for Maduena-Young, Celia: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2015-00009305 Maduena-Young, Celia $45.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2015
  • FinancialFinancial info for Maduena-Young, Celia: Transaction Assessment $45.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2015
  • FinancialFinancial: Maduena-Young, Celia; Total Financial Assessment $60.00; Total Payments and Credits $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2015
  • DocketCause Of Action- Action Plaintiff's Claim ; File Date: 06/17/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2015
  • DocketPlaintiff's claim mailed certified mail- Comment: Tracking number: 70131090000114714186

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim filed- Plaintiff's Claim filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Escallate, LLC is a litigant