This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/01/2018 at 14:23:31 (UTC).

Cavalry SPV vs. Pao C. Vang/CC

Case Summary

On 06/13/2012 Cavalry SPV filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Pao C Vang/CC. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Clovis Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0644

  • Filing Date:

    06/13/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Clovis Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cavalry SPV I, LLC

Defendants

Vang, Pao C

Vang, Pao C.

Other

Vang, Pao

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jensen, Casey M

 

Court Documents

Return filed

Return filed; Comment: Return of Writ of Execution wholly unsatisfied Filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2013
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Clerk's Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Return filed- Return filed; Comment: Return of Writ of Execution wholly unsatisfied Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2015
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$25.00 was made on receipt CLCE354860.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2015
  • Writ of execution issued- Comment: Writ of execution issued to the county of Fresno in the amount of $23557.84. IP 02/27/15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2015
  • Memo of costs after judgment- Comment: Memorandum of costs after judgment, acknowledgement of credits and declaration of accrued interest filed. Credit: $0 Interest: $4085.76 Costs: $0 IP 02/27/15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2013
  • Clerk's default judgment- Comment: Documents in support of judgment filed. Judgment entered on 1/4/13 for plaintiff Cavalry SPV I LLC against defendant Pao C Vang aka Pao Vang in the sum of: Principal: $15,265.08 Interest: $ 3,762.00 Atty Fees: $ 0.00 Costs: $ 420.00 Total: $19,447.08 hf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2012
  • Request to Enter Default Filed- Comment: w/ judgment ja

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2012
  • Request to Enter Default filed- Comment: Request to Enter Default filed. Default entered as to Pao C Vang aka Pao Vang hf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2012
  • Request for Dismissal of Does- Comment: Request for dismissal of doe defendants filed and dismissal entered without prejudice. hf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2012
  • Declaration filed- Comment: Declaration re waiver of attorney fees filed. hf

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 06/15/2012
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$370.00 was made on receipt CLCL39375.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2012
  • Summons filed- Comment: Declaration of venue filed. lmi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2012
  • JBSIS: New Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2012
  • Declaration filed- Comment: Declaration of venue filed. lmi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2012
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Complaint filed lmimmons issued . Event: Civil complaint filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2012
  • Civil Case Cove Sheet 3.740- Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. Case designated as a CRC Rule 3.740 Collections Case. lmi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2012
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: lmi Event: New Civil Case Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2012
  • Financial info for Cavalry SPV I, LLC: Counter Payment Receipt # 39375 Cavalry SPV I, LLC $370.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2012
  • Financial info for Cavalry SPV I, LLC: Transaction Assessment $370.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2012
  • Financial: Cavalry SPV I, LLC; Total Financial Assessment $370.00; Total Payments and Credits $370.00

    Read MoreRead Less