This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/06/2018 at 09:17:28 (UTC).

Cassidy Ewers vs Community Regional Medical/DISMIS

Case Summary

On 10/29/2013 Cassidy Ewers filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against Community Regional Medical/DISMIS. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Smith, Bruce and Smith, M. Bruce. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3394

  • Filing Date:

    10/29/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Smith, Bruce

Smith, M. Bruce

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ewers, Cassidy

Defendants

Community Regional Medical Center

Graham PA-C, Thomas M

Cohler MD, Larry

Uttam MD, Jai

Bhatt MD, Ashwin N

Community Anesthesia Providers Medical Group Inc

Uttam, Jai, Medical Doctor

Cohler, Larry, Medical Doctor

Graham, Thomas M

Bhatt, Ashwin N, Medical Doctor

Valley Cardiac Surgery

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Donahue, Thomas E.

Donahue & Horrow, Llp 1960 E. Grand Avenue Suite 1215

El Segundo, CA 90245

Defendant Attorneys

White, William M.

Jones, Jerry D.

Weiss, Andrew R.

Beltramo, Mario L., JR

Pollara, Dominique A.

Leaf, Abigail R.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/06/2014
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Conversion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2015
  • Jury Trial- Judicial Officer: Smith, Bruce; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2015
  • Trial Readiness- Judicial Officer: Smith, Bruce; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2015
  • Mandatory Settlement Conference- Judicial Officer: Judge, Pro Tempore; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2014
  • CRC225 Dismiss After Settlement- Original Type: CRC225 Dismiss After Settlement; Hearing Time: 01:00 PM; Result: Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2014
  • Off calendar- Comment: Off calendar for 225 scheduled for 11/24/14 . All parties have been dismissed rls

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2014
  • Motion - Compel- Original Type: Motion - Compel; Judicial Officer: Smith, Bruce; Hearing Time: 03:27 PM; Result: Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2014
  • Notice of entry of dismissal- Comment: Notice of entry of dismissal filed. gs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2014
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Request for dismissal of party Jal Ultam, M.D. (only) filed and dismissal entered With prejudice. gs Event: Dismissal filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2014
  • Notice of entry of dismissal- Comment: Notice of entry of dismissal filed. le

    Read MoreRead Less
103 More Docket Entries
  • 12/24/2013
  • Financial info for Community Regional Medical Center: Counter Payment Receipt # 185418 Community Regional Medical Center $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2013
  • Financial info for Community Regional Medical Center: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2013
  • Financial info for Community Regional Medical Center: Counter Payment Receipt # 184811 Community Regional Medical Center $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2013
  • Financial info for Community Regional Medical Center: Transaction Assessment $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2013
  • Financial: Community Regional Medical Center; Total Financial Assessment $735.00; Total Payments and Credits $735.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2014
  • Financial info for Ewers, Cassidy: Counter Payment Receipt # 187201 Ewers, Cassidy $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2014
  • Financial info for Ewers, Cassidy: Transaction Assessment $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2013
  • Financial info for Ewers, Cassidy: Counter Payment Receipt # 183494 Ewers, Cassidy $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2013
  • Financial info for Ewers, Cassidy: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2013
  • Financial: Ewers, Cassidy; Total Financial Assessment $585.00; Total Payments and Credits $585.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Cohler, Larry, Medical Doctor is a litigant

Latest cases where Community Regional Medical Center is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Weiss, Andrew R.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Beltramo, Mario L., JR