This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 08:10:44 (UTC).

Casey Bair vs. Bayer Corp.

Case Summary

On 02/23/2017 Casey Bair filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Bayer Corp. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Simpson, Alan and Cullers, Mark. The case status is Other - Stayed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0620

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other - Stayed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Simpson, Alan

Cullers, Mark

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Stark, Amy

Stewart, Leai

Villareal, Katherine

Bubnis, Tiffany

Chase, Marguerite

Cooke, Lisa

Bair, Casey

Earl, Aleicia

Ruiz, Elizabeth

Defendants

Bayer Healthcare LLC

Conceptus, Inc., a Delaware corporation

a Delaware company

Bayer Corp.

Bayer Essure Inc.

a Delaware corporation

an Indiana corporation

Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Bates, Kyle G.

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service

POS Bayer Essure Inc. 170310.pdf; Comment: Bayer Essure Inc. (F/K/A Conceptus, Inc.)

Civil Complaint filed

Bair Essure_Complaint_Operative 170223 FINAL.pdf

Proof of Service

[Bair] POS of Process.pdf; Comment: Defective- not served personally or on POS-010 form

Proof of Service

POS Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc..pdf; Comment: Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc.

Notice Filed

BAIR Ntc of Submission 170309.pdf; Comment: Notice of Submission

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing; Comment: OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGE FOR ALL PURPOSES

Proof of Service

POS D Bayer Healthcare LLC 170310.pdf; Comment: Bayer Healthcare LLC

Judgment

Order Granting Coordination; Judicial Officer: Simpson, Alan; Judgment Type: Order Granting Coordination

Civil case cover sheet

Civil case cover sheet.pdf

Notice of Removal of Action

Notice

Proof of Service

Bair Proof of Service.pdf; Comment: Proof of Service

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing; Comment: CMC set for 8/7/17 at 1:30pm Rm #305

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing; Comment: Status Conference set for 9/8/17 at 9am Dept. #404

Stipulation Filed

Stipulation Filed; Comment: Case remanded back to Superior Court

Proof of Service

BAIR POS of process as to D Bayer Corp. 170310.pdf; Comment: Bayer Corp.

Notice Filed

Ntc re Add-On Petition.pdf; Comment: Notice of Entry of Order Granting Petition for Coordination of Add-On Case with Essure Product Cases Coordinated Proceeding, JCCP 4887

Summons issued and filed

Proposed Summons for 17CECG00620 170301.pdf; Summons issued and filed

Summons issued and filed

Proposed Summons for 17CECG00620 170301.pdf; Summons issued and filed

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Order Granting Coordination; Judicial Officer: Simpson, Alan; Judgment Type: Order Granting Coordination

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Amended Document Filed- FINAL Amended Complaint Bair 181030.pdf; Comment: 1st Amended Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • Status Conference- Judicial Officer: Cullers, Mark; Hearing Time: 9:04 AM; Cancel Reason: Off Calendar; Comment: re: stay filed 3-9-17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • Case Management Conference- Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Off Calendar; Comment: Case remanded back to Superior Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice Filed- Ntc re Add-On Petition.pdf; Comment: Notice of Entry of Order Granting Petition for Coordination of Add-On Case with Essure Product Cases Coordinated Proceeding, JCCP 4887

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing- Notice of Hearing; Comment: CMC set for 8/7/17 at 1:30pm Rm #305

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Stipulation Filed- Stipulation Filed; Comment: Case remanded back to Superior Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • Case Management Conference- Judicial Officer: Simpson, Alan; Hearing Time: 3:28 PM; Cancel Reason: Case Stayed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Removal of Action- Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2017
  • Summons and Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 03/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice Filed- BAIR Ntc of Submission 170309.pdf; Comment: Notice of Submission

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice or Order Staying Action- BAIR Ntc of Stay of Proceedings 170308.pdf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service- [Bair] POS of Process.pdf; Comment: Defective- not served personally or on POS-010 form

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed- Proposed Summons for 17CECG00620 170301.pdf; Summons issued and filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing- Notice of Hearing; Comment: OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGE FOR ALL PURPOSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Complaint filed- Bair Essure_Complaint_Operative 170223 FINAL.pdf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil case cover sheet- Civil case cover sheet.pdf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2017
  • Financial info for Earl, Aleicia: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2017-10571 Earl, Aleicia $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2017
  • Financial info for Earl, Aleicia: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2017
  • Financial: Earl, Aleicia; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.