This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/13/2018 at 10:28:34 (UTC).

Cargo Ray, LLC. vs. Kristin Taylor

Case Summary

On 10/26/2016 Cargo Ray, LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Kristin Taylor. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2434

  • Filing Date:

    10/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Clovis Storage

Cargo Ray, LLC.

Cargo Bay, LLC.

Defendant

Taylor, Kristin

 

Court Documents

Judgment

Small Claims Court orders action dismissed; Judicial Officer: Judge, Pro Tempore; Judgment Type: Small Claims Court orders action dismissed; Party Names: Cargo Bay, LLC.; Taylor, Kristin; Comment: without prejudice

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of; Comment: Name: Justin Clark

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment; Comment: Clerks certificate of mailing attached.

Request Filed

Request Filed; Comment: 3rd Continuance (in court) for service

Request Filed

Request Filed; Comment: 2nd continuance for service

Request Filed

Request Filed; Comment: 1rst Continuance for service

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: Declaration of Due Diligence

Plaintiff's Claim filed

Plaintiff's Claim filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Small Claims Court orders action dismissed; Judicial Officer: Judge, Pro Tempore; Judgment Type: Small Claims Court orders action dismissed; Party Names: Cargo Bay, LLC.; Taylor, Kristin; Comment: without prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment Mailed to All Parties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • Court Trial- Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of- Authorization to Appear on Behalf of; Comment: Name: Justin Clark

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment; Comment: Clerks certificate of mailing attached.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request Filed- Request Filed; Comment: 3rd Continuance (in court) for service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2017
  • Court Trial- Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard; Parties Present- Plaintiff: Cargo Bay, LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Request Filed- Request Filed; Comment: 2nd continuance for service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Request Filed- Request Filed; Comment: 1rst Continuance for service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service- Proof of Service; Comment: Declaration of Due Diligence

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2016
  • Cause Of Action- Action Plaintiff's Claim ; File Date: 10/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Plaintiff's Claim filed- Plaintiff's Claim filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2017
  • Financial info for Cargo Bay, LLC.: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2017-00003665 Justin Clark $2.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2017
  • Financial info for Cargo Bay, LLC.: Transaction Assessment $2.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2016
  • Financial info for Cargo Bay, LLC.: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2016-00042113 Cargo Ray, LLC. $2.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2016
  • Financial info for Cargo Bay, LLC.: Transaction Assessment $2.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2016
  • Financial info for Cargo Bay, LLC.: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2016-00035903 Eddings Attorney Support Svcs, Inc. $30.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2016
  • Financial info for Cargo Bay, LLC.: Transaction Assessment $30.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2016
  • Financial: Cargo Bay, LLC.; Total Financial Assessment $35.00; Total Payments and Credits $35.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.