This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 12/05/2021 at 15:22:35 (UTC).

Capital One Bank vs Polly Gutierrez

Case Summary

On 05/12/2010 Capital One Bank filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Polly Gutierrez. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Sanger Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Ikeda, Dale. The case status is Other - Stayed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0150

  • Filing Date:

    05/12/2010

  • Case Status:

    Other - Stayed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Ikeda, Dale

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Capital One Bank (USA) N.A.

Defendant

Gutierrez, Polly

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Walsh, Mark D.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/25/2011
  • DocketCase Restored to Court's Control

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2011
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Bankruptcy Documents Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2011
  • DocketBankruptcy documents filed- Comment: Bankruptcy documents filed. sss

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2010
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Bankruptcy Documents Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2010
  • DocketBankruptcy documents filed- Comment: Bankruptcy documents filed. sss

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2010
  • DocketCollection Case Review- Original Type: Collection Case Review; Judicial Officer: Ikeda, Dale; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Result: Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2010
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Bankruptcy Documents Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2010
  • DocketBankruptcy documents filed- Comment: Bankruptcy documents filed. sss

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2010
  • DocketOff calendar- Comment: Off calendar for CCR Hearing scheduled for November 12, 2010. Default Court Judgment filed. sss

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2010
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Presiding Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 09/02/2010
  • DocketDeclaration in re: CCP585d- Comment: Declaration pursuant to CCP 585d filed. sss

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2010
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default filed- Comment: Request to enter default filed. Default entered as to Polly Gutierrez mn

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2010
  • DocketPOS of summons & comp - subst.- Comment: Proof of service of summons and complaint; affidavit of venue; civil case cover sheet; notice of collection case review hearing; alternative dispute resolution (adr) packet filed showing substituted service on Polly Gutierrez on 05/19/10, mailed on 05/20/10. mn

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2010
  • DocketJBSIS: New Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2010
  • DocketNotice Col Case Review Prtd- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CSAEVNT on 12-MAY-2010 by MNEANG.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2010
  • DocketPayment- Comment: A Payment of -$330.00 was made on receipt CLSA6377.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2010
  • DocketAffidavit filed- Comment: Affidavit of Venue filed. mn

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2010
  • DocketCivil Case Cove Sheet 3.740- Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. Case designated as a CRC Rule 3.740 Collections Case. mn

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2010
  • DocketZ_Conversion- Comment: Complaint filed - summons issued . mn Event: Civil complaint filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2010
  • DocketZ_Conversion- Comment: mn Event: New Civil Case Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEGAL RECOVERY LAW OFFICES INC. - MARK D. WALSH