This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 12/05/2021 at 15:47:41 (UTC).

Capital One Bank VS Jeske/CCR/STAY

Case Summary

On 12/23/2010 Capital One Bank filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Jeske/CCR/STAY. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Reedley Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The case status is Other - Stayed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0621

  • Filing Date:

    12/23/2010

  • Case Status:

    Other - Stayed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Capital One Bank (USA), N.A.

Defendants

Jeske, Julie

Jeske, Ted L

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Golden, Richard E

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/26/2012
  • DocketCase Restored to Court's Control

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2012
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Bankruptcy Discharge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2012
  • DocketNotice of Removal of Action- Comment: Bandruptcy discharge before hearing. jpv

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2012
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Bankruptcy Documents Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2012
  • DocketBankruptcy documents filed- Comment: Bankruptcy documents filed. jp

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2012
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Bankruptcy Documents Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2012
  • DocketBankruptcy documents filed- Comment: Bankruptcy documents filed. Notice of Incomplete filing and notice of intent to dismiss case if documents are not timely filed. jp

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2012
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Bankruptcy Documents Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2012
  • DocketBankruptcy documents filed- Comment: Notice of filing Bankruptcy petition by all Debtor's name Theodore Louis Jeske and Julie A Jeske filed, staying action. jp

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2012
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Bankruptcy Documents Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 04/11/2011
  • DocketDismissal of party- Comment: Request for dismissal of party(s) as to Does 1 through 5, Inclusive only, filed and dismissal enteredWithout prejudice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2011
  • DocketRequest enter default denied- Comment: Request for entry of default filed. Default not entered as requested for the following reason: Cost amount is incorrect. Cost does not add up to $ 514.00. lc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2011
  • DocketPOS of summons & comp personal- Comment: Proof of service of summons and complaint filed showing personal service on Ted L Jeske on 01/09/11. lc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2011
  • DocketPOS of summons & comp personal- Comment: Proof of service of summons and complaint filed showing personal service on Julie Jeske on 01/09/11. lc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2010
  • DocketPayment- Comment: A Payment of -$370.00 was made on receipt CLRE12984.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2010
  • DocketJBSIS: New Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2010
  • DocketCivil Case Cove Sheet 3.740- Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. Case designated as a CRC Rule 3.740 Collections Case. jp

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2010
  • DocketZ_Conversion- Comment: Complaint filed - summons issued . Event: Civil complaint filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2010
  • DocketSummons filed- Comment: Summons on Collections Complaint filed. jp

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2010
  • DocketZ_Conversion- Comment: Event: New Civil Case Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Golden, Richard E