This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 12/07/2021 at 19:07:04 (UTC).

Capital One Bank (USA) vs Robert C Cotner

Case Summary

On 10/02/2009 Capital One Bank USA filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Robert C Cotner. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Sanger Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Ikeda, Dale. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0349

  • Filing Date:

    10/02/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Ikeda, Dale

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Capital One Bank (USA), N.A.

Defendant

Cotner, Robert C

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Hunt, Michael S

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/16/2012
  • DocketSatisfaction of judgment-full- Comment: Acknowledgement of full satisfaction of judgment filed. sss

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2010
  • DocketCollection Case Review- Original Type: Collection Case Review; Judicial Officer: Ikeda, Dale; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Result: Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2010
  • FinancialFinancial info for Capital One Bank (USA), N.A.: Counter Payment Receipt # 6322 Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2010
  • FinancialFinancial info for Capital One Bank (USA), N.A.: Transaction Assessment $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2010
  • FinancialFinancial: Capital One Bank (USA), N.A.; Total Financial Assessment $25.00; Total Payments and Credits $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2010
  • DocketPayment- Comment: A Payment of -$25.00 was made on receipt CLSA6322.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2010
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment issued- Comment: Abstract of Judgment issued. sss

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2010
  • DocketOff calendar- Comment: Off calendar for CCR Hearing scheduled for October 8, 2010 . Default Judgment filed. sss

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2010
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Clerk's Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2010
  • DocketClerk's default judgment- Comment: Documents in support of judgment filed. Judgment entered on April 5, 2010 for plaintiff(s) Capital One Bank (USA)NA against defendant(s) Robert C Cotner in the sum of: sss Principal: $2,354.83 Interest: $ 300.30 Atty Fees: $ 0 Costs: $ 255.00 Total: $2,910.13

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 04/02/2010
  • DocketNotice of Cal Setting Printed- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CSAEVNT on 02-APR-2010 by MNEANG.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2010
  • DocketZ_Conversion- Comment: Case continued by party: Plaintiff to 10/08/10 at 11:00a.m. in Sanger for further CCR. Reason for continuance: to submit default package mn Event: Case Continued by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2010
  • DocketCollection Case Review- Judicial Officer: Ikeda, Dale; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2010
  • DocketPOS of summons & comp - subst.- Comment: Proof of service of summons and complaint; ADR Package; Notice of Collection Case Review Hearing filed showing substituted service on Ms Cotner Female, Caucasian, 5'4 135lbs Blonde hair, 25 yrs Daughter co-resident, competent member of the household mailed on December 17, 2009 . sss

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2009
  • DocketJBSIS: New Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2009
  • DocketNotice Col Case Review Prtd- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CMAINIT on 02-OCT-2009 by KROSPIGLIOSI.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2009
  • DocketPayment- Comment: A Payment of -$205.00 was made on receipt CLSA5774.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2009
  • DocketCivil Case Cove Sheet 3.740- Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. Case designated as a CRC Rule 3.740 Collections Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2009
  • DocketZ_Conversion- Comment: Complaint filed - summons issued . Event: Civil complaint filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2009
  • DocketZ_Conversion- Comment: Event: New Civil Case Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HUNT MICHAEL S