This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 02/21/2018 at 05:42:04 (UTC).

Capital One Bank USA, N.A. v Laurie Hargreaves/DIS

Case Summary

On 06/07/2010 Capital One Bank USA, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Laurie Hargreaves/DIS. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Clovis Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Fain, Gregory. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0820

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Clovis Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Fain, Gregory

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Capital One Bank USA, N.A.

Defendant

Hargreaves, Laurie

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Walsh, Mark D.

 

Court Documents

Judgment

Request for Dismissal filed; Judgment Type: Request for Dismissal filed; Party Names: Capital One Bank USA, N.A.; Hargreaves, Laurie; Comment: with prejudice

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Request for Dismissal filed; Judgment Type: Request for Dismissal filed; Party Names: Capital One Bank USA, N.A.; Hargreaves, Laurie; Comment: with prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2012
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Conversion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2012
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Request for Dismissal filed. Entire action of all parties and all causes of action dismissed without prejudice. cg Event: Dismissal filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2010
  • Collection Case Review- Original Type: Collection Case Review; Judicial Officer: Fain, Gregory; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2010
  • Off calendar- Comment: Off calendar for CCR scheduled for 12-23-10 PSN.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2010
  • Notice of settlement filed- Comment: Notice of settlement of entire action filed pursuant to CRC 3.1385. Dismissal to be filed by: 12-15-12 psn

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2010
  • Summons & comp - personal- Comment: Summons returned and filed with proof of service of summons and complaint on Laurie Hargreaves by personal service on 06/12/10 . cm

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2010
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$205.00 was made on receipt CLCL30556.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2010
  • JBSIS: New Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2010
  • Affidavit filed- Comment: Affidavit of venue filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2010
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Complaint filed - summons issued . Event: Civil complaint filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2010
  • Civil Case Cove Sheet 3.740- Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. Case designated as a CRC Rule 3.740 Collections Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2010
  • Notice Col Case Review Prtd- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CDAEVNT on 07-JUN-2010 by CMOLINA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2010
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Event: New Civil Case Filed

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.