This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 06/18/2022 at 20:17:10 (UTC).

Capital Collections, LLC vs. Jeffrey Penry

Case Summary

On 04/10/2018 Capital Collections, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Jeffrey Penry. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Fresno County BF Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Diaz, Monica. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3802

  • Filing Date:

    04/10/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Diaz, Monica

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Capital Collections, LLC

Defendants

Penry, Jeffrey

Penry, Marian

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Hrdlicka, Steven R

 

Court Documents

Notice Filed

Notice Filed; Comment: of Case Management Confernece set for August 20th, 2018 at 11:00 a.m in Department 305.

Summons issued and filed

Summons; Summons issued and filed

Summons issued and filed

Summons; Summons issued and filed

Declaration Filed

Declaration; Comment: for Reduction of Filing Fee

Judgment

Default Judgment by Court; Judicial Officer: Diaz, Monica; Judgment Type: Default Judgment by Court; Party Names: Capital Collections, LLC; Penry, Jeffrey; Penry, Marian; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To:; Capital Collections, LLC; Awarded Against:; Penry, Jeffrey; Penry, Marian; Amount; Damages: $4,396.69; Pre-Judgment Interest Rate: 10.00 %; Pre-Judgment Interest: $1,304.40; Attorney Fees: $879.33; Costs: $318.50; Total: $6898.92

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Request to Enter Default

Request to Enter Default

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Minute Order Attachment

10/23/2018: Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

08/20/2018: Minute Order Attachment

Request to Enter Default

08/14/2018: Request to Enter Default

Proof of Service

08/14/2018: Proof of Service

Request for Entry of Default

08/14/2018: Request for Entry of Default

Request to Enter Default Denied

06/08/2018: Request to Enter Default Denied

Request for Entry of Default

06/08/2018: Request for Entry of Default

Request to Enter Default

06/04/2018: Request to Enter Default

Dismissal of Doe Defendant(s)

06/04/2018: Dismissal of Doe Defendant(s)

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/19/2018
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer: Diaz, Monica; Judgment Type: Default Judgment by Court; Party; Names: Capital Collections, LLC; Penry, Jeffrey; Penry, Marian; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To; Capital Collections, LLC; Awarded Against; Penry, Jeffrey; Penry, Marian; Amount; Damages: $4,396.69; Pre-Judgment Interest Rate: 10.00 %; Pre-Judgment Interest: $1,304.40; Attorney Fees: $879.33; Costs: $318.50; Total: $6898.92

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order Attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • DocketDefault Hearing; Judicial Officer: Diaz, Monica; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order Attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • DocketSummons and Complaint; Served: 04/28/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service; Comment: Marian Penry

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Default Received; Comment: Without Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 06/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service; Comment: re: Jeffrey Penry

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Default Received; Comment: HRG 08/20/18 Request for Entry of Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • FinancialFinancial info for Capital Collections, LLC: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2018-28658 Capital Collections, LLC $181.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • FinancialFinancial info for Capital Collections, LLC: Transaction Assessment $181.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • FinancialFinancial: Capital Collections, LLC; Total Financial Assessment $181.00; Total Payments and Credits $181.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Filed; Comment: of Case Management Confernece set for August 20th, 2018 at 11:00 a.m in Department 305.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration of Reduced Filing Fee Filed

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

ATTORNEY OR PARTY WITHOUT ATTORNEY (Name, State Bar number, and address): FOR COURT USE ONLY STEVEN R. HRDLICKA #117557

— ATTORNEY AT LAW E-FILED

1221 VAN NESS, 2ND FLOOR FRESNO, CA 93721 . FRESNO. CA 93721 .4/10/2018 3:22 PM TELEPHONE NO: 559 485-1453 FAX NO, (Optional): FRESNO COUNTY SUPERIOR COUR E-MAIL ADDRESS (Opfional) By: K.Sullivan, Deputy ATTORNEY FOR (Name): PLAINTIPFF SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA, COUNTY OF FRESNO sTREETADDRESS: B.F. SISK COURTHOUSE MAILING ADDRESS: 1130 'O' STREET ciITY anD zIp cobe: FRESNO, CA 93724 BRANCH Name: CIVIL LIMITED, CENTRAL DIVISION

PLAINTIFF: CAPITAL COLLECTIONS, LLC, DEFENDANT: JEFFREY PENRY; MARIAN PENRY;

DOES1TO 10;

CONTRACT

COMPLAINT [ ] AMENDED COMPLAINT (Number):

[ ] CROSS-COMPLAINT [__] AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT (Number):

Jurisdiction (check all that apply): CASE NUMBER:

ACTION IS A LIMITED CIVIL CASE

Amount demanded does not exceed $10,000 [ ] exceeds $10,000, but does not exceed $25,000 18CECLO3802 E ACTION IS AN UNLIMITED CIVIL CASE (exceeds $25,000) ACTION IS RECLASSIFIED by this amended complaint or cross-complaint from limited to unlimited [ ] from unlimited to limited

1. Plaintiff* (name or names): CAPITAL COLLECTIONS, LLC

alleges causes of action against defendant* (name or names): JEFFREY PENRY; MARIAN PENRY; DOES 1 TO 10; 2. This pleading, including attachments and exhibits, consists of the following number of pages: 20 3. a. Each plaintiff named above is a competent adult except plaintiff (name): CAPITAL COLLECTIONS, LLC (ASSIGNEE OF LE PROVENCE

APARTMENTS)

(1) "] a corporation qualified to do business in California (2) [__] an unincorporated entity (describe): (3) other (specify) A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

b. || Plaintiff (name): a. |__| has complied with the fictitious business name laws and is doing business under the fictitious name (specify):

b. [ ] has complied with all licensing requirements as a licensed (specify):

c. || Information about additional plaintiffs who are not competent adults is shown in Attachment 3c. 4. a. Each defendant named above is a natural person

except defendant (name): [ ] except defendant (name): (1) [__] a business organization, form unknown (1) [ ] abusiness organization, form unknown (2) [ Ja corporation (2) [ Ja corporation (3) [ an unincorporated entity (describe): (3) (1 an unincorporated entity (describe): (4) | __| a public entity (describe): (4) [__] a public entity (describe): (5) [_| other (specify): (5) [__] other (specify): * |t thig.form is used as & cro i it , Page 1 of 2

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Capital Collections, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Hrdlicka, Steven R.