This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/06/2018 at 14:19:28 (UTC).

Camelot Lake Holdings, LLC v Gabriela Hernandez/UD

Case Summary

On 12/16/2013 Camelot Lake Holdings, LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Gabriela Hernandez/UD. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Ikeda, Dale. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1522

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Ikeda, Dale

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Camelot Lake Holdings, LLC

Defendants

Hernandez, Gabriela

Castillo-Alvarez, Oscar Ivan

Other

All Other Occupants

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Altounian, Gregory L.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2014
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Default Judgment by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2014
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Conversion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2014
  • Minute order printed- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CDAEVNT on 05-MAR-2014 by JVERBERA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2014
  • Default Judgment by Court- Comment: Judgment on entire action upon default of defendant(s) Gabriela Hernandez and Oscar Ivan Castillo-Alvarez signed by Judge D. Ikeda and filed. Judgment entered in favor of Plaintiff(s) Camelot Lakes Holdings, LLC against Defendant(s) Gabriela Hernandez and Oscar Ivan Castillo-Alvarez in the amount of: Past due rent: $ 629.00 Holdover Damages: $ 775.72 Attorney Fees: $ 600.00 Costs: $ 524.00 Total: $ 2528.72 lmi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2014
  • Minute order Judge Ikeda- Comment: Minute Order from Dept.: 401 Clerk: J Verbera Reporter: 10:59:37 Nature of Hearing: Money Damages Appearing Parties: Plaintiff: Gregory Altounian, Esq. Money damages granted see signed order Attorney Gregory Altounian is sworn and testifies. Court takes judicial ntoiceof the rental agreement, 3-day notice and proof of service already in the court file. Order signed on the record. Notice waived. lmi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2014
  • Money Damages- Judicial Officer: Ikeda, Dale; Hearing Time: 02:04 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2014
  • Unlawful Detainer Dismissal- Original Type: Unlawful Detainer Dismissal; Judicial Officer: Ikeda, Dale; Hearing Time: 01:30 PM; Result: Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2014
  • Matter set for hearing- Comment: Matter set for Money Damages on 03-03-14 at 2:00p.m. in dept #401. mn

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2014
  • Writ filed satisfied poss only- Comment: Writ of execution and return filed, satisfied as to possession only. JL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2014
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$25.00 was made on receipt CLCE327353.

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 12/19/2013
  • App for Publication of Summons- Comment: Order for service of Summons by Posting Publication signed by Judge on .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2013
  • Restricted Access Notice sent- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from GUAGMNU on 19-DEC-2013 by CYBARRA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2013
  • Restricted Access Notice sent- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from GUAGMNU on 19-DEC-2013 by CYBARRA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • JBSIS: New Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$240.00 was made on receipt CLCE323996.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Summons filed- Comment: Summons on UD Complaint filed. ed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Unlawful Detainer Complaint filed. Access to case records restricted for 60 days from date of filing pursuant to CCP 1161.2 ed Event: Unlawful Detainer Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Civil case cover sheet- Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Event: New Civil Case Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Notice of UD Dismissal Hrg- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CMAINIT on 16-DEC-2013 by EDUQUE.

    Read MoreRead Less